This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:33:33 (UTC).

Singletary et al v. U.S. Bank National Association et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Singletary filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against U S Bank National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary Gordon Baker, Margaret B Seymour and Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03394

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mary Gordon Baker

Presiding Judges

Margaret B Seymour

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Singletary

North Charleston, SC 29418

Helen Singletary

North Charleston, SC 29418

Defendants

U.S. Bank National Association

Mr. Cooper

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Magalie Arcure Creech

Attorney at Finkel Law Firm

Po Box 41489

Charleston, SC 29423

Brian A Calub

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP (Char NC)

201 N Tryon Street, Suite 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER. The Singletary's are hereby ordered to complete and return the Court's Interrogatories to the Court within twenty-one days from the date this ordered is entered (plus three days for mail time). You must send any future filings in this case to the Clerk of Court, Post Office Box 835, Charleston, South Carolina 29402. You are ordered to always keep the Clerk of Court advised in writing if your address changes for any reason. Your failure to do so will not be excused by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Special Interrogatories)(hada, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

3 #1

Special Interrogatories

10 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by U.S. Bank National Association.(Calub, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

11 #2

Exhibit Foreclosure Complaint

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court by U.S. Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 1/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Calub, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) provided by filing user added on 1/3/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (hada, ). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #3

Request for Admissions and Production of Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A Calub on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Calub, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

11 #3

Exhibit Amended Affidavit of Service

1 #2

Notice of Removal

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mr. Cooper, U.S. Bank National Association, filed by John Singletary, Helen Singletary. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Request for Admissions and Production of Documents)(hada, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER. Plaintiffs shall have through February 7, 2020, in which to respond to the Motion to Remand and to submit their completed interrogatories. Plaintiffs are advised that if they fail to respond to the Motion to Remand, the Court will consider the Motion to be uncontested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/23/2020. (hada, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

1 #1

Supporting Documents

6 #2

Request for Admissions and Production of Documents

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Striking Motion to Dismiss and Jury Trial Demand, #2 Exhibit Foreclosure Complaint, #3 Exhibit Amended Affidavit of Service)(Calub, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #16 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to John and Helen Singletary 4321 Waterview Circle North Charleston, SC 29418 (hada, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER. Plaintiffs shall have through February 7, 2020, in which to respond to the Motion to Remand and to submit their completed interrogatories. Plaintiffs are advised that if they fail to respond to the Motion to Remand, the Court will consider the Motion to be uncontested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/23/2020. (hada, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#13) ***DOCUMENT MAILED 12 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to John and Helen Singletary 4321 Waterview Circle North Charleston, SC 29418 (hada, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#12) Case Reassigned to Judge Bruce Howe Hendricks. Judge Margaret B Seymour no longer assigned to the case. (suro, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Striking Motion to Dismiss and Jury Trial Demand, #2 Exhibit Foreclosure Complaint, #3 Exhibit Amended Affidavit of Service)(Calub, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand to State Court by U.S. Bank National Association. Response to Motion due by 1/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Calub, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) provided by filing user added on 1/3/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (hada, ). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A Calub on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Calub, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by U.S. Bank National Association.(Calub, Brian) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #3 Order and Court Interrogatories, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to John and Helen Singletary 4321 Waterview Circle North Charleston, SC 29418 (hada, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mr. Cooper, U.S. Bank National Association, filed by John Singletary, Helen Singletary. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Request for Admissions and Production of Documents)(hada, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER. The Singletary's are hereby ordered to complete and return the Court's Interrogatories to the Court within twenty-one days from the date this ordered is entered (plus three days for mail time). You must send any future filings in this case to the Clerk of Court, Post Office Box 835, Charleston, South Carolina 29402. You are ordered to always keep the Clerk of Court advised in writing if your address changes for any reason. Your failure to do so will not be excused by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Special Interrogatories)(hada, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mr. Cooper, U.S. Bank National Association ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200016818.), filed by John Singletary, Helen Singletary. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Request for Admissions and Production of Documents)(hada, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.