This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:17:32 (UTC).

Singh v. Stanley

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Property - Other Eviction case was filed by Singh against Stanley in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03807

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Mark H. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ravi P. Singh

Defendant

David Stanley

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to David Stanley re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #6 Letter. (dob) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER APPROVING and ADOPTING #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court. The action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/19/2019. (adg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/30/2019. (adg) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#6

(#6) Remand Letter to Cobb County Magistrate Court (adg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#3

(#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County re #2 Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/30/2019. (adg) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by David Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to David Stanley re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #6 Letter. (dob) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #6 Remand Letter to Cobb County Magistrate Court. (adg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Stanley re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #6 Remand Letter. (adg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Remand Letter to Cobb County Magistrate Court (adg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (adg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER APPROVING and ADOPTING #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court. The action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/19/2019. (adg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Notification of Docket Correction re Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Modified on 9/3/2019 to correct Judge information. (adg) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to David Stanley re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by David Stanley, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (adg) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/30/2019. (adg) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County re #2 Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/30/2019. (adg) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by David Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/30/2019. c:Financial Office(adg) Modified on 9/3/2019 to correct Judge information(adg). (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (tcc) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.