This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/31/2022 at 08:15:40 (UTC).

Singh v. SP Inc.,

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Singh filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against SP Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-80537

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sujitar Singh

Defendants

SP Inc., d/b/a Thai Haru Restaurant

SP, Inc. doing business as Thai Haru Restaurant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle James Lee

Attorney at Lee Law, PLLC

1971 West Lumsden Boulevard, Suite 303

Brandon, FL 33511

Defendant Attorney

Alan David Danz

Attorney at Danz Law, PLLC

11011 Sheridan Street, Suite 314

Hollywood, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) STATUS REPORT by Sujitar Singh (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#21

(#21) Defendant's RESPONSE to #18 Statement OF CLAIM by SP, Inc.. (Danz, Alan) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM VTC, ( Settlement Conference set for 7/14/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/10/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#19

(#19) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#18

(#18) Statement of: Claim by Sujitar Singh re #9 Order (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#17

(#17) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons by SP, Inc. (Danz, Alan) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Sujitar Singh re #11 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Discovery Plan (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#15

(#15) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by SP, Inc.. Attorney Alan David Danz added to party SP, Inc.(pty:dft). (Danz, Alan) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#11

(#16) NOTICE by Sujitar Singh re #11 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Discovery Plan (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#9

(#18) Statement of: Claim by Sujitar Singh re #9 Order (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Calendar Call set for 10/19/2022 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Sujitar Singh (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Other Affiliates by Sujitar Singh (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sujitar Singh. SP, Inc. served on 4/8/2022, response/answer due 4/29/2022. (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to SP, Inc. (mee) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summon(s) Summons

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STATUS REPORT by Sujitar Singh (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Defendant's RESPONSE to #18 Statement OF CLAIM by SP, Inc.. (Danz, Alan) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM VTC, ( Settlement Conference set for 7/14/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/10/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Statement of: Claim by Sujitar Singh re #9 Order (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons by SP, Inc. (Danz, Alan) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Sujitar Singh re #11 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Discovery Plan (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by SP, Inc.. Attorney Alan David Danz added to party SP, Inc.(pty:dft). (Danz, Alan) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket(#14) PAPERLESS ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: The Court has carefully reviewed Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause [DE 13]. It appears, based upon the representations of counsel--Kyle James Lee, Esq.--that he failed to attend the Scheduling Conference because he primarily practices in the Middle District of Florida and is unfamiliar with the Court's procedures in scheduling case management conferences, and because he inadvertently failed to list his paralegal as a person to receive service and did not therefore receive notice. The Court accepts the good-faith representations in the Response and declines to sanction Mr. Lee or refer him to Bar authorities. The Order to Show Cause [DE 12] is therefore DISCHARGED. No further action will be taken by the Court, and the Court considers this matter closed. However, the Court cautions counsel that any future failure to appear at a hearing may have serious consequences. The Court expects that counsel has taken, and will continue to take, appropriate steps to avoid this issue from recurring. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 4/28/2022. (cpe) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 12 Order to Show Cause,,,,, by Sujitar Singh. (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2022
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: The hearing was held via Zoom Video Teleconference. Scheduling Conference held on 04/26/2022. Plaintiff's counsel did not appear. The Court will issue an Order to Show Cause to Plaintiff's counsel. Total time in court: 01 minutes. (Digital 11:41:05) (kza) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING FLSA SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 4/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2022 at 11:30 AM in the West Palm Beach Division before U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference (VTC). Any motions to modify the existing trial date should be filed two (2) business days prior to the Scheduling Conference. Motions to modify the trial date must specifically state the basis for the request, including detailed factual support, and must provide a compelling reason. The parties are further advised that the Court is strongly disinclined to modify the trial date based upon the scheduling "tracks" contained within the Local Rules and/or based upon vague references to the complexities of the case. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 540 3826 and Passcode: 246129. All counsel shall appear by both audio and video. Because of the expedited nature of the conference, the parties are relieved of Local Rule 16.1(b)'s conference report requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 4/21/2022. (cpe) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Calendar Call set for 10/19/2022 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Sujitar Singh (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Other Affiliates by Sujitar Singh (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sujitar Singh. SP, Inc. served on 4/8/2022, response/answer due 4/29/2022. (Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to SP, Inc. (mee) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SP Inc., d/b/a Thai Haru Restaurant. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15526327, filed by Sujitar Singh. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Kyle) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan David Danz