This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:43:05 (UTC).

Singh v. Secretary, Department of Corrections

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Singh filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip R. Lammens and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00617

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kenard Singh

Defendants

SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Florida Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rachael Elizabeth Reese

Attorney at O'Brien Hatfield, PA

511 W Bay St Ste 330

Tampa, FL 33606-3533

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed by Kenard Singh. (Reese, Rachael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by Kenard Singh (Reese, Rachael) Modified on 12/6/2019 (LMF). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 113A-16215456) filed by Kenard Singh.(Reese, Rachael) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit Petition

#7

(#7) ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. and Notice to Petitioner. Petitioner has 45 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. (Marion County). Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition)(CRR) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Sworn Oath for 2254 Petition by Kenard Singh (Reese, Rachael) Modified on 12/30/2019 (HAI). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (JLC) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. and Notice to Petitioner. Petitioner has 45 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. (Marion County). Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition)(CRR) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Sworn Oath for 2254 Petition by Kenard Singh (Reese, Rachael) Modified on 12/30/2019 (HAI). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (JLC) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#4) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-617-Oc-37PRL. (SJB) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by Kenard Singh (Reese, Rachael) Modified on 12/6/2019 (LMF). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed by Kenard Singh. (Reese, Rachael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 113A-16215456) filed by Kenard Singh.(Reese, Rachael) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.