This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2021 at 08:04:51 (UTC).

Singh v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Singh filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and Margo K. Brodie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06179

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Singh

Defendants

Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Doe Corporations 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Harris Kovel

Attorney at Kovel Law PLLC

301 East 79Th Street, Apt. 18A, 10075

New York City, NY 10075

Defendant Attorney

Howard M Wexler

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Wexler, Howard) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#11

(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Wexler, Howard) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 4/8/2021 @ 10:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-6179. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/8/2021. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#9

(#9) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (On Consent) by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Wexler, Howard) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Howard M Wexler on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Wexler, Howard) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Singh. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Kovel, Daniel) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

#6

(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Richard Singh (Kovel, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Richard Singh (Kovel, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Doe Corporations 1-5, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13869201 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Richard Singh. (Kovel, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Wexler, Howard) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Wexler, Howard) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 4/8/2021 @ 10:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-6179. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/8/2021. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - ANSWER DUE 2/12/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/8/2021. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (On Consent) by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Wexler, Howard) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Howard M Wexler on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Wexler, Howard) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Singh. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Kovel, Daniel) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Richard Singh (Kovel, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Richard Singh (Kovel, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Doe Corporations 1-5, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13869201 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Richard Singh. (Kovel, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard M Wexler