This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2022 at 09:15:01 (UTC).

Singh v. Jaddou

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 Singh filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Jaddou. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01915

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harpreet Singh

Defendant

Ur Jaddou

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Andrew Brown

Defendant Attorney

Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Ur Jaddou answer due 12/16/2022. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/13/2022) (oyh) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Ur Jaddou answer due 12/16/2022. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/13/2022) (oyh) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ur Jaddou. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response filed by Ur Jaddou (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ on behalf of Ur Jaddou. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to Ur Jaddou, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (mlb) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harpreet Singh. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Brown, Steven) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ur Jaddou filed by Harpreet Singh. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-13073522) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Brown, Steven) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less