This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2020 at 10:48:03 (UTC).

Singh v. Gillis et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Singh filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Gillis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C. Bramlette, III and Michael T. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00096

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Bramlette, III

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Manpreet Singh

Respondents

Stanley Crockett

Shawn Gillis

William P. Barr

Chad Wolf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

James Paul Tinsley

Attorney at MIDDLETON & TINSLEY LAW FIRM

P. O. Box 3129, 2604 West Main St., Suite C (38801)

Tupelo, MS 38803

Paul B. Grotas - PHV

Attorney at THE GROTAS FIRM, PC

450 7Th Avenue, Sutie 2303

New York, NY 10123

Respondent Attorneys

Angela Givens Williams-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Jackson

501 East Court Street, Suite 4.430

Jackson, MS 39201

Mitzi Dease Paige-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Jackson

501 East Court Street, Suite 4.430

Jackson, MS 39201

Jennifer Case-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Jackson

501 East Court Street, Suite 4.430

Jackson, MS 39201

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER denying #6 Motion for Release from Detention or Bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 4, 2020. (MMc) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

(#16) ORDER directing supplemental briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 19, 2020. (MMc) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#15

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#14) Response to Order re #9 ORDER directing Petitioner's counsel to show cause on or before 5/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 4, 2020. (MMc) filed by Manpreet Singh (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Tinsley, #2 Affidavit Attorney Grotas, #3 Supplement New Jersey Certificate)(Tinsley, James) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER setting briefing schedule re Motion #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 4, 2020. (MMc) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER, the proper Respondent is Shawn Gillis, Warden of Adams County Correctional Center. Respondent Warden of Adams County Correctional Center shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this order. Chad Wolf, William P. Barr and Stanley Crockett terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 4/7/2020.[Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER denying #6 Motion for Release from Detention or Bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 4, 2020. (MMc) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Order #16 . Respondent's supplemental briefing due on or before 6/8/2020. Petitioner's reply due on or 6/15/2020. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 28, 2020. (MMc) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Court's Order [ECF No. 16] filed by Shawn Gillis (Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Court's Order [ECF No. 16] Opposing Extension filed by Manpreet Singh (Tinsley, James) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER setting expedited briefing schedule re Motion #17 for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall respond to the Motion #17 on or before 5/28/2020. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 27, 2020. (MMc) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Court's Order [ECF No. 16] by Shawn Gillis (Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER directing supplemental briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 19, 2020. (MMc) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion for Emergency release from Detention or bond filed by Manpreet Singh (Tinsley, James) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Response to Order re #9 ORDER directing Petitioner's counsel to show cause on or before 5/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 4, 2020. (MMc) filed by Manpreet Singh (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Tinsley, #2 Affidavit Attorney Grotas, #3 Supplement New Jersey Certificate)(Tinsley, James) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Emergency MOTION Release from detention or Bond filed by Shawn Gillis (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Hagan Declaration, #2 Attachment 2 - Medical Form)(Case-Federal Gov, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER directing Petitioner's counsel to show cause on or before 5/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 4, 2020. (MMc) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER setting briefing schedule re Motion #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 4, 2020. (MMc) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Respondent's RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Shawn Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Timothy Zwetow, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Granting Stay, #3 Exhibit 3 - 5th Circuit Docket Sheet)(Paige-Federal Gov, Mitzi) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Emergency MOTION Release from detention or Bond by Manpreet Singh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Record, #2 Affidavit Paul Grotas, Esq., #3 Affidavit Sukpal Singh)(Tinsley, James) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn Gillis (Attorney General of United States) served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (PKM) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Shawn Gillis served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (PKM) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Shawn Gillis (Civil Process Clerk) as to Shawn Gillis served on 4/10/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. (PKM) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketPetitioner is represented by counsel; copy of Order was not mailed to petitioner. (LDR) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER, the proper Respondent is Shawn Gillis, Warden of Adams County Correctional Center. Respondent Warden of Adams County Correctional Center shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service of a copy of this order. Chad Wolf, William P. Barr and Stanley Crockett terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 4/7/2020.[Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 paid; receipt number 34643059008 ), filed by Manpreet Singh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A - Custody Order, #2 Exhibit 1B - Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Board's decision and Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - USCA Order, #5 Exhibit 4 - Bond Exhibits, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less