This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2021 at 09:41:28 (UTC).

Singh v. Gadsden Etowah County Progress Council Inc

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 Singh filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Gadsden Etowah County Progress Council Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Corey L Maze. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01777

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kendra Singh

Defendant

Gadsden Etowah County Progress Council Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sandra B Reiss

Attorney at THE REISS FIRM LLC

Po Box 660121

Vestavia, AL 35226

Roderick Twain Cooks

Attorney at WINSTON COOKS LLC

505 20Th Street North, Suite 815

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorney

C Peter Bolvig, III

Attorney at Whitaker Mudd Luke & Wells

2011 Fourth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cooks, Roderick) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/3/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gadsden Etowah County Progress Council Inc. filed by Gadsden Etowah County Progress Council Inc (Bolvig, C) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Gadsden Etowah County Progress Council Inc.(Bolvig, C) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

1 #3

Right to Sue

1 #2

Filed Cover and Charge

1 #1

EEOC Letter of Determination

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Gadsden Etowah County Progress Council Inc, filed by Kendra Singh. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Letter of Determination, #2 Filed Cover and Charge, #3 Right to Sue)(SRD) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3742559 (B4601110490). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Gadsden Etowah County Progress Council Inc, filed by Kendra Singh. (Attachments: # 1 EEOC Letter of Determination, # 2 Filed Cover and Charge, # 3 Right to Sue)(SRD). (Reiss, Sandra) Modified on 12/29/2020 (MEB2). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER Telephone Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, January 12, 2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Corey L. Maze. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel of record. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/22/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cooks, Roderick) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/3/2020. (SRD) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gadsden Etowah County Progress Council Inc. filed by Gadsden Etowah County Progress Council Inc (Bolvig, C) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Gadsden Etowah County Progress Council Inc.(Bolvig, C) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Gadsden Etowah County Progress Council Inc, filed by Kendra Singh. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Letter of Determination, #2 Filed Cover and Charge, #3 Right to Sue)(SRD) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer C Peter Bolvig, III