This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:18:04 (UTC).

Singh v. Choate

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Singh filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Choate. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon P. Gallagher and Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00909

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Gordon P. Gallagher

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Surjit Singh

Aurora, CO 80010

Respondents

Ronald Vitiello

Jeffrey D Lynch

Johnny Choate

Kirstjen M. Nielsen

William P. Barr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

William Dean Carter

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#33

RESTRICTED

#32

RESTRICTED

#29

RESTRICTED

#28

RESTRICTED

#30

RESTRICTED

#22

RESTRICTED

#17

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

3 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#3

(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/15/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.] (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #26 Response to Amended Habeas Petition, #33 Minute Order, to Surjit Singh, A079602619, ICE Aurora Processing Center-GEO Detention Facility, A3, 11901 East 30th Avenue, Aurora, CO 80010. Text Only Entry (nmarb, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/11/19 re: #32 Letter filed by Surjit Singh. Petitioners request for a copy of the government's response is granted. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail Petitioner one copy of the Respondents Response to Order to Show Cause and the attachment thereto (ECF Nos. 26 and 26-1), along with a copy of this Minute Order, at his address of record listed on the docket. Finally, the Court will provide Petitioner with additional time to file a reply to the Respondents Response to Order to Show Cause. Petitioner may file a reply within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Minute Order. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) LETTER re: #22 Order to Show Cause, requesting a status update, by Petitioner Surjit Singh. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #27 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/13/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE from Special Assistant United States Attorney W. Dean Carter, that the Plaintiff plans to consent to United States Magistrate Jurisdiction. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Order To Show Cause, upon Johnny Choate on 5/21/19, filed by Petitioner Surjit Singh. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Respondent Johnny Choate All parties consent.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Carter, William) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) RESPONSE to #17 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Johnny Choate. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Lauciello)(Carter, William) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#25) Consent Form due by 6/24/2019. Text Only Entry (lgale, ) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service by Certified Mail as to #23 upon United States Attorney General on 5/29/19, filed by Petitioner Surjit Singh. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER OF TRANSFER TO THE DISTRICT OF COLORADO. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Prisoner Statement of Account. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Surjit Singh. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Surjit Singh.(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Surjit Singh. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Surjit Singh. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Surjit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.] (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/15/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.] (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.] (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Surjit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/27/2019.] (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.