This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:35:41 (UTC).

Singh Gurwinder v. David W. Jennings et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Singh Gurwinder filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against David W Jennings. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02348

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Singh Gurwinder

Adelanto, CA 92301

Respondents

Warden of Immigration Detention Facility

Kirstjen M. Nielson

Ronald D. Vitiello

Jeff Sessions

David W. Jennings

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Bashir Ghazialam

Attorney at Law Offices of Bashir Ghazialam

Po Box 928167

San Diego, CA 92192

Respondent Attorneys

OIL-DCS Trial Attorney

Attorney at Office of Immigration Litigation

Po Box 868 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

312 North Spring Street 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4700

Jill S Casselman

Attorney at AUSA - US Attorneys Office

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7615

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

4 #2

*Restricted*

#10

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

4 #1

*Restricted*

#5

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION AND DENYING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: that Respondents file Answer to the Petition not later than 1/27/2020. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 1/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (sbou) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#11

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Why Petition Should Not Be Dismissed as Moot by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Petitioner must file his response to this Order to Show Cause no later than 14 days from the date of this Order. (See document for details.) (sbou) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PETITIONER Singh Gurwinder. Dismissal is without. (Ghazialam, Bashir) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bashir Ghazialam counsel for Petitioner Singh Gurwinder. Adding BASHIR GHAZIALAM as counsel of record for SINGH GURWINDER for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PETITIONER SINGH GURWINDER. (Attorney Bashir Ghazialam added to party Singh Gurwinder(pty:pet))(Ghazialam, Bashir) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Why Petition Should Not Be Dismissed as Moot by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Petitioner must file his response to this Order to Show Cause no later than 14 days from the date of this Order. (See document for details.) (sbou) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR OF INCORRECT PAGES Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) #1 , MOTION for Appointment of Counsel #2 . See CLERK'S CORRECTIONS, documents #6 and #7. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S CORRECTIONS re MOTION filed by Petitioner Singh Gurwinder, correcting MOTION for Appointment of Counsel #2 (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S CORRECTIONS re PETITION filed by Petitioner Singh Gurwinder, correcting Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jill S Casselman counsel for Respondents David W. Jennings, Kirstjen M. Nielson, Jeff Sessions, Ronald D. Vitiello, Warden of Immigration Detention Facility. Adding Jill S. Casselman as counsel of record for David W. Jennigs, Ronald D. Vitiello, Kristjen M. Nielsen, Jeff Sessions, and Warden of Immigration Detention Facility for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondents David W. Jennings, Ronald D. Vitiello, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jeff Sessions; and Warden Of Immigration Detention Facility. (Attorney Jill S Casselman added to party David W. Jennings(pty:res), Attorney Jill S Casselman added to party Kirstjen M. Nielson(pty:res), Attorney Jill S Casselman added to party Jeff Sessions(pty:res), Attorney Jill S Casselman added to party Ronald D. Vitiello(pty:res), Attorney Jill S Casselman added to party Warden of Immigration Detention Facility(pty:res))(Casselman, Jill) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION AND DENYING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: that Respondents file Answer to the Petition not later than 1/27/2020. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 1/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (sbou) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111) (esa) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by petitioner Singh Gurwinder. (esa) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth, (Filing fee due), filed by petitioner Singh Gurwinder. (esa) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.