This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2021 at 10:08:29 (UTC).

Singh et al v. Deloitte LLP et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 Singh filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Deloitte LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08458

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rupinder Singh

Jeffrey S. Popkin

Joni Walker

Jenny Mark

Defendants

Deloitte LLP

The Board of Directors of Deloitte LLP

The Retirement Plan Committee of Deloitte LLP

John Does 1-30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald R. Reavey

Attorney at Capozzi & Associates, P.C.

Po Box 5866

Harrisburg, PA 82498

Gabrielle Kelerchian

Attorney at Capozzi Adler PC

312 Old Lancaster Road

Merion Station, PA 19066

Mark K. Gyandoh

Attorney at Capozzi Adler

312 Old Lancaster Road

Merion Station, PA 19066

Defendant Attorneys

Jared Robin Killeen

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP (PA)

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Brian Thomas Ortelere

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP (Philadelphia)

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The pre-Trial conference scheduled for 12/21/21 is canceled. The case is otherwise stayed payed a decision by the Court on the Defendant's motion to stay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/3/2021) (ks) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#22

(#22) CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Responsive Pleading Deadline addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Brian T. Ortelere dated December 2, 2021. Document filed by Deloitte LLP, The Retirement Plan Committee of Deloitte LLP..(Ortelere, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#21

(#21) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Supreme Court in Hughes v. Northwestern University. . Document filed by Deloitte LLP, The Retirement Plan Committee of Deloitte LLP..(Ortelere, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#20

(#20) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Supreme Court in Hughes v. Northwestern University. Document filed by Deloitte LLP, The Retirement Plan Committee of Deloitte LLP..(Ortelere, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#19

(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Joni Walker, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Jenny Mark, Rupinder Singh..(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#18

(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Joni Walker, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Jenny Mark, Rupinder Singh..(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#17

(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Joni Walker, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Jenny Mark, Rupinder Singh..(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Retirement Plan Committee of Deloitte LLP waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. Document filed by Joni Walker; Jeffrey S. Popkin; Jenny Mark; Rupinder Singh..(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Joni Walker, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Jenny Mark, Rupinder Singh..(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

5 #5

Main Document

4 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

4 #1

Affidavit for Admission of Donald Reavey

4 #4

Main Document

3 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

3 #1

Affidavit for Admission of Mark Gyandoh

3 #3

Main Document

#2

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCase Stayed (ks) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The pre-Trial conference scheduled for 12/21/21 is canceled. The case is otherwise stayed payed a decision by the Court on the Defendant's motion to stay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/3/2021) (ks) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and Responsive Pleading Deadline addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Brian T. Ortelere dated December 2, 2021. Document filed by Deloitte LLP, The Retirement Plan Committee of Deloitte LLP..(Ortelere, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Supreme Court in Hughes v. Northwestern University. . Document filed by Deloitte LLP, The Retirement Plan Committee of Deloitte LLP..(Ortelere, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Supreme Court in Hughes v. Northwestern University. Document filed by Deloitte LLP, The Retirement Plan Committee of Deloitte LLP..(Ortelere, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Joni Walker, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Jenny Mark, Rupinder Singh..(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Joni Walker, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Jenny Mark, Rupinder Singh..(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Joni Walker, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Jenny Mark, Rupinder Singh..(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Retirement Plan Committee of Deloitte LLP waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022. Document filed by Joni Walker; Jeffrey S. Popkin; Jenny Mark; Rupinder Singh..(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Joni Walker, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Jenny Mark, Rupinder Singh..(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Donald R. Reavey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jenny Mark, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Rupinder Singh, Joni Walker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donald R. Reavey, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Reavey, Donald) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Mark K. Gyandoh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jenny Mark, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Rupinder Singh, Joni Walker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark K. Gyandoh, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #5 MOTION for Gabrielle P. Kelerchian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order; the filing fee was not paid;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (wb) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4 MOTION for Donald R. Reavey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25191445. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #3 MOTION for Mark K. Gyandoh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25191372. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Gabrielle P. Kelerchian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jenny Mark, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Rupinder Singh, Joni Walker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Admission of Gabrielle Kelerchian, #2 Certificate of Good Standing).(Kelerchian, Gabrielle) Modified on 10/14/2021 (wb). (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Donald R. Reavey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25191445. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jenny Mark, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Rupinder Singh, Joni Walker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Admission of Donald Reavey, #2 Certificate of Good Standing).(Reavey, Donald) Modified on 10/14/2021 (wb). (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Mark K. Gyandoh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25191372. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jenny Mark, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Rupinder Singh, Joni Walker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Admission of Mark Gyandoh, #2 Certificate of Good Standing).(Gyandoh, Mark) Modified on 10/14/2021 (wb). (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Deloitte LLP, The Retirement Plan Committee of Deloitte LLP, John Does 1-30. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25191118)Document filed by Joni Walker, Jeffrey S. Popkin, Jenny Mark, Rupinder Singh..(Gyandoh, Mark) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deloitte USA LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN T. ORTELERE