This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2020 at 07:08:23 (UTC).

Sinanovic v. Wagner College

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Sinanovic filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wagner College. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and LaShann DeArcy Hall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05181

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sabrina Sinanovic

Defendant

Wagner College

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Ignatius Marchese

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sabrina Sinanovic. Wagner College waiver sent on 11/5/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Wagner College. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wagner College filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13593638 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Sabrina Sinanovic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Marchese, Joseph) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wagner College is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph I Marchese