This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 14:18:13 (UTC).

Sims v. Wal-Mart Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Sims filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00261

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dorothy Sims

Defendants

Wal-Mart Inc. doing business as Sam's Club, Inc.

John and Jane Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raynetra L. Gustavis

Attorney at CHHABRA & GIBBS, PA

120 North Congress Street, Suite 200

Jackson, MS 39201

Defendant Attorneys

J. Caroline Johnson

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Thomas M. Louis

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosure due by 6/11/2021; Jury Trial set for a two-week term court commencing 7/18/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A (Jackson) Jordan before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III; Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2022, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.750 (Jackson) Jordan before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III; Discovery due by 2/4/2022; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2021; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 7/5/2021; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 11/8/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 12/6/2021; Motions due by 2/18/2022; Settlement Conference set for 3/24/2022 09:00 AM in Chambers 5.150 (Jackson) Ball before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Seven (7) days before the settlement conference, the parties must submit via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov an updated CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM. All parties, including a person with full settlement authority, are required to be present at the conference unless excused by the Court. If a party believes the scheduled settlement conference would not be productive and should be cancelled, the party is directed to inform the Court via e-mail of the grounds for their belief at least seven (7) days prior to the conference. ADR Report due by 6/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/11/2021. (JEJ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Disclosure by Dorothy Sims (Gustavis, Raynetra) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Wal-Mart Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Wal-Mart Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#3

(#3) State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Inc. (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C- Copies of process, pleadings served on Sams

1 #2

Exhibit B- PLs Responses to RFA

1 #1

Exhibit A- Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Inc. from Madison County Circuit Court, MS, case number 45CI1:21-cv-28-JE. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4530852) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- PLs Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit C- Copies of process, pleadings served on Sams, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosure due by 6/11/2021; Jury Trial set for a two-week term court commencing 7/18/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A (Jackson) Jordan before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III; Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2022, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.750 (Jackson) Jordan before Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III; Discovery due by 2/4/2022; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2021; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 7/5/2021; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 11/8/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 12/6/2021; Motions due by 2/18/2022; Settlement Conference set for 3/24/2022 09:00 AM in Chambers 5.150 (Jackson) Ball before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Seven (7) days before the settlement conference, the parties must submit via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov an updated CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM. All parties, including a person with full settlement authority, are required to be present at the conference unless excused by the Court. If a party believes the scheduled settlement conference would not be productive and should be cancelled, the party is directed to inform the Court via e-mail of the grounds for their belief at least seven (7) days prior to the conference. ADR Report due by 6/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/11/2021. (JEJ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 6/4/2021 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Raynetra Gustavis and Caroline Johnson. (JEJ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Disclosure by Dorothy Sims (Gustavis, Raynetra) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Wal-Mart Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Wal-Mart Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Inc. (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Inc. (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Inc. from Madison County Circuit Court, MS, case number 45CI1:21-cv-28-JE. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4530852) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- PLs Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit C- Copies of process, pleadings served on Sams, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal Mart doing business as Wal Mart Supercenter Store #1439 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Caroline Johnson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas M. Louis