This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 18:27:21 (UTC).

SIMS v. VANSCHOYCK et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 SIMS filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against VANSCHOYCK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Mario Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00230

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Mario Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN SIMS

Carlisle, IN 47838

Defendants

KELLY INDA

SHAKEFER

BENNETH

DICK BROWN

MCCLOUD

E. DRADE

RAIN HARR KULYNYCA

MARTIN

HILL

A. BOURLORD

S. VANSCHOYCK

FRANK LITTLEJOHN

B. HIATT

S. MURPHY

G. WILLIAMS

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JOHN SIMS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#4

(#4) ENTRY DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE - Mr. Sims shall have twenty-eight days from the date this Order is docketed to pay the $402.00 filing fee for this civil action. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/8/2021.(KAA) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US Mail. (TMC) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BENNETH, A. BOURLORD, DICK BROWN, E. DRADE, B. HIATT, HILL, KELLY INDA, RAIN HARR KULYNYCA, FRANK LITTLEJOHN, MARTIN, MCCLOUD, S. MURPHY, SHAKEFER, S. VANSCHOYCK, G. WILLIAMS, filed by JOHN SIMS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by JOHN SIMS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE - Mr. Sims shall have twenty-eight days from the date this Order is docketed to pay the $402.00 filing fee for this civil action. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/8/2021.(KAA) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US Mail. (TMC) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BENNETH, A. BOURLORD, DICK BROWN, E. DRADE, B. HIATT, HILL, KELLY INDA, RAIN HARR KULYNYCA, FRANK LITTLEJOHN, MARTIN, MCCLOUD, S. MURPHY, SHAKEFER, S. VANSCHOYCK, G. WILLIAMS, filed by JOHN SIMS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McCloud is a litigant

Latest cases where Martin is a litigant

Latest cases where Hill is a litigant