This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:13:40 (UTC).

Sims v. Town of Batesburg-Leesville Police Department et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Sims filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Town of Batesburg-Leesville Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shiva V Hodges, Joseph F Anderson, Jr and Mary Geiger Lewis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03513

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shiva V Hodges

Presiding Judges

Joseph F Anderson, Jr

Mary Geiger Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henry N. Sims

Defendants

Batesburg-Leesville Police Department, Town of

Connie Billings

Wallace Oswald

Town of Batesburg-Leesville Police Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Daniel Dickey, Jr

Attorney at Dickey Law Group LLC

440 Center Street

West Columbia, SC 29169

Defendant Attorneys

Charles F Thompson, Jr

Attorney at Malone Thompson Summers and Ott

339 Heyward Street, Suite 200

Columbia, SC 29201

Michael D Malone

Attorney at Malone Thompson and Summers

1312 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201-1288

Lake E Summers

Attorney at Malone Thompson and Summers

1312 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201-1288

 

Court Documents

1 #1

State Court Documents

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Batesburg-Leesville Police Department, Town of, Connie Billings, Wallace Oswald.(Thompson, Charles) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER (Rule 26 Report due by 1/23/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/18/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/18/2020, Discovery due by 7/16/2020, Motions due by 7/31/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/20/2019. (bgoo) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Batesburg-Leesville Police Department, Town of, Connie Billings, Wallace Oswald. (lbak) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Henry N. Sims.(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Lexington Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-32-03415. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8834391), filed by Connie Billings, Batesburg-Leesville Police Department, Town of, Wallace Oswald. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (lbak) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#7) Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis. Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (glev, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER (Rule 26 Report due by 1/23/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/18/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/18/2020, Discovery due by 7/16/2020, Motions due by 7/31/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/20/2019. (bgoo) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Batesburg-Leesville Police Department, Town of, Connie Billings, Wallace Oswald.(Thompson, Charles) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Henry N. Sims.(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Batesburg-Leesville Police Department, Town of, Connie Billings, Wallace Oswald. (lbak) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Lexington Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-32-03415. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8834391), filed by Connie Billings, Batesburg-Leesville Police Department, Town of, Wallace Oswald. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (lbak) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.