This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 09:05:00 (UTC).

Sims v. Medtronic Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Sims filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brantley Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02872

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Debra Sims

Defendants

Medtronic, Inc.

Medtronic Inc

Medtronic Logistics LLC

Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co

Medtronic USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ellen A Presby

Attorney at Van Wey Presby & Williams PLLC

12720 Hillcrest Road, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75230

Ben C Martin

Attorney at Martin Baughman PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75219

Laura Jean Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75219

Daniel J MacDonald

Attorney at Martin Baughman PLLC

3710 Rawlins, Suite 1230

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Logistics LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co, Medtronic USA Inc. (ykp) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Debra Sims. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#2

(#2) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint. (Presby, Ellen) Modified text on 9/17/2020 (mjr). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

1 #19

Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-1150-2008

1 #14

Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-1573-2013

1 #13

Exhibit(s) Letter from George Aram

1 #10

Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-1570-2014

1 #9

Exhibit(s) Letter from Mike Ronningen

1 #8

Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-0896-2018

1 #7

Exhibit(s) FDA Form 483 2013

1 #6

Exhibit(s) FDA Warning Letter 2012

1 #5

Exhibit(s) FDA Form 483 2008

1 #4

Exhibit(s) FDA Warning Letter 2009

1 #3

Exhibit(s) FDA Form 483 2007

1 #2

Exhibit(s) FDA Warning Letter 2007

1 #1

Exhibit(s) FDA Warning Letter 2006

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Debra Sims filed by Debra Sims. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11178980) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) FDA Warning Letter 2006, #2 Exhibit(s) FDA Warning Letter 2007, #3 Exhibit(s) FDA Form 483 2007, #4 Exhibit(s) FDA Warning Letter 2009, #5 Exhibit(s) FDA Form 483 2008, #6 Exhibit(s) FDA Warning Letter 2012, #7 Exhibit(s) FDA Form 483 2013, #8 Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-0896-2018, #9 Exhibit(s) Letter from Mike Ronningen, #10 Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-1570-2014, #11 Exhibit(s) Letter from Mike Crader, #12 Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-2382-2008, #13 Exhibit(s) Letter from George Aram, #14 Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-1573-2013, #15 Exhibit(s) Complaint for Permanent Injunction, #16 Exhibit(s) Consent Decree of Permanent Injunction, #17 Exhibit(s) Intentionally Left Blank, #18 Exhibit(s) Medtronic Urgent Medical Device Correction, #19 Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-1150-2008) (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Logistics LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co, Medtronic USA Inc. (ykp) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Debra Sims. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint. (Presby, Ellen) Modified text on 9/17/2020 (mjr). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Debra Sims filed by Debra Sims. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11178980) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) FDA Warning Letter 2006, #2 Exhibit(s) FDA Warning Letter 2007, #3 Exhibit(s) FDA Form 483 2007, #4 Exhibit(s) FDA Warning Letter 2009, #5 Exhibit(s) FDA Form 483 2008, #6 Exhibit(s) FDA Warning Letter 2012, #7 Exhibit(s) FDA Form 483 2013, #8 Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-0896-2018, #9 Exhibit(s) Letter from Mike Ronningen, #10 Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-1570-2014, #11 Exhibit(s) Letter from Mike Crader, #12 Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-2382-2008, #13 Exhibit(s) Letter from George Aram, #14 Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-1573-2013, #15 Exhibit(s) Complaint for Permanent Injunction, #16 Exhibit(s) Consent Decree of Permanent Injunction, #17 Exhibit(s) Intentionally Left Blank, #18 Exhibit(s) Medtronic Urgent Medical Device Correction, #19 Exhibit(s) FDA Recall No. Z-1150-2008) (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J. McDonald