This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2022 at 08:02:26 (UTC).

Simpson v. Schlumberger et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 Simpson filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Schlumberger. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robin J. Cauthron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00336

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin J. Cauthron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Simpson

Defendants

Schlumberger

Schlumberger Technology Corporation

Lizette Bouddhou

Jason Carter

Rob Brown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ashley C Weyland

Attorney at Bussett Legal Group PLLC

2201 N Classen Blvd

Oklahoma City, OK 73106

Jonathan M Irwin

Attorney at Ward & Glass LLP

1601 36Th Avenue Nw, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73072

Defendant Attorneys

Maggie M Logan

Attorney at Tomlinson McKinstry PC

211 N Robinson Ave, Suite 450

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Toby M McKinstry

Attorney at Tomlinson McKinstry PC

211 N Robinson Ave, Suite 450

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw Its Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 06/07/22. (wh) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Withdraw #4 MOTION to Dismiss [Schlumberger Technology Corporation's Special appearance and Motion to Dismiss] by Schlumberger. (McKinstry, Toby) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 06/01/22. (wh) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#9

(#9) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by James Simpson. (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 5/30/2022. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 05/16/22. (wh) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#7

(#7) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss [Schlumberger Technology Corporation's Special appearance and Motion to Dismiss] by James Simpson. (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan M Irwin on behalf of James Simpson (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Schlumberger . (McKinstry, Toby) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

4 #3

Exhibit 3. Return of Service - STC

4 #2

Exhibit 2. Summons to Defendants

4 #1

Exhibit 1. Petition

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Toby M McKinstry on behalf of Schlumberger (McKinstry, Toby) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Maggie M Logan on behalf of Schlumberger (Logan, Maggie) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

1 #14

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #11

Exhibit 11- Return of Service on Schlumberger

1 #6

Exhibit 6- Entry of Appearance Jonathan Irwin

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Petition

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw Its Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 06/07/22. (wh) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Withdraw #4 MOTION to Dismiss [Schlumberger Technology Corporation's Special appearance and Motion to Dismiss] by Schlumberger. (McKinstry, Toby) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 06/01/22. (wh) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by James Simpson. (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 5/30/2022. Signed by Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 05/16/22. (wh) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss [Schlumberger Technology Corporation's Special appearance and Motion to Dismiss] by James Simpson. (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan M Irwin on behalf of James Simpson (Irwin, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Schlumberger . (McKinstry, Toby) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss [Schlumberger Technology Corporation's Special appearance and Motion to Dismiss] by Schlumberger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Petition, #2 Exhibit 2. Summons to Defendants, #3 Exhibit 3. Return of Service - STC)(McKinstry, Toby) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Toby M McKinstry on behalf of Schlumberger (McKinstry, Toby) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Maggie M Logan on behalf of Schlumberger (Logan, Maggie) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3894149. (McKinstry, Toby) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Canadian County, case number CJ-2021-351 filed by Schlumberger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- Entry of Appearance R. Bussett, #3 Exhibit 3- Entry of Appearance A Weyland, #4 Exhibit 4- Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit 5- Order Allowing Withdrawal, #6 Exhibit 6- Entry of Appearance Jonathan Irwin, #7 Exhibit 7- Summons to Lizette Bouddhou, #8 Exhibit 8- Summons to Schlumberger, #9 Exhibit 9- Summons to Rob Brown, #10 Exhibit 10- Summons to Jason Carter, #11 Exhibit 11- Return of Service on Schlumberger, #12 Exhibit 12- State Court Docket, #13 Exhibit 13- Service of Process Notice, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schlumberger LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley C Weyland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan M Irwin