This case was last updated from PACER on 07/03/2020 at 09:19:25 (UTC).

Simpson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 Simpson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark H. Cohen and John K. Larkins, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01914

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

Referral Judge

John K. Larkins, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wanda Ezell Simpson

Defendant

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathleen Marie Flynn

Attorney at Law Offices of Kathleen M. Flynn

Suite 940, 315 West Ponce De Leon Ave.

Decatur, GA 30030

Ida Comerford

Attorney at Law Offices of Kenneth Hiller, PLLC

Suite 1A, 6000 N. Bailey Avenue

Amherst, NY 14226

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 5/5/2020. (dob) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#2

(#2) SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed by Wanda Ezell Simpson. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 6/8/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Hiller, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ida Comerford on behalf of Wanda Ezell Simpson (Comerford, Ida) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Attorney General of the United States, US Attorney for the Northern District of Georgia. (dob) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 5/5/2020. (dob) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT filed by Wanda Ezell Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Wanda Ezell Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit -A, #3 Exhibit -B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summon(s) -3)(eop) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less