This case was last updated from PACER on 01/09/2020 at 07:04:46 (UTC).

Simpson v. Commissioner Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 11/10/2019 Simpson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Anna J. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01808

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anna J. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas L Simpson

Defendant

Commissioner Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tim D. Wilborn

Attorney at Wilborn Law Office, P.C.

P.O. Box 370578

Las Vegas, NV 89137

Defendant Attorney

Renata Gowie

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office District of Oregon

1000 Sw Third Ave, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (kf) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 11/19/2019, answer due on 3/18/2020. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Wilborn, Tim) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kf) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (kf) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6077270. Filed by Thomas L Simpson against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Wilborn, Tim) (Entered: 11/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.