This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/26/2022 at 08:05:47 (UTC).

Simpson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 Simpson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Knepp II, David A. Ruiz and William H. Baughman, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00133

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Knepp II

Referral Judges

David A. Ruiz

William H. Baughman, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn Simpson

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley J. Davis

Attorney at Regas & Haag

4184 Holiday Street, N.W.

Canton, OH 44718

Defendant Attorneys

Rema Alberta Ina

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland - Social Security

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Social Security Administration - Chicago

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/25/2022. (H,JL) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 1/26/2022. (G,CA) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Related document(s) #1 . (Ina, Rema) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketPursuant to General Order 2022-03, the referral to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz is withdrawn. This case has been randomly reassigned and automatically referred to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. If the parties wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned magistrate judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), they should complete and electronically file with the Clerk of Court a Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge form. (V,AR) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Consent Package issued. (G,CA) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 1/26/2022. (G,CA) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 1/26/2022. (G,CA) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketAutomatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge James R. Knepp II on 1/25/2022. (H,JL) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/25/2022. (H,JL) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (H,JL) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (H,JL) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketJudge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (H,JL) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Shawn Simpson. Related document(s) #1 . (Davis, Bradley) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Shawn Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 USM-285) (Davis, Bradley) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rema A Ina