This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2019 at 07:45:11 (UTC).

Simpson v. Central Resource, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Simpson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Central Resource, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sam R Cummings and James Wesley Hendrix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00045

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sam R Cummings

James Wesley Hendrix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Simpson

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Maximus, Inc.

General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.

Equifax Information Services LLC

Central Resource, Inc.

TransUnion LLC

Experian Information Solutions Inc

Central Research, Inc.

Nelnet Servicing LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Micah Stephen Adkins

Attorney at The Adkins Firm PC

1025 Westhaven Blvd., Suite 220

Franklin, TN 37064

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin W Brown

Attorney at Waller Lansden Dortch & Davis, LLP

100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

Forrest Mathew Seger, III

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

2301 Broadway

San Antonio, TX 78215

Sarah Nichols Wariner

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

2600 Dallas Parkway, Suite 600

Frisco, TX 75034

Monica Frugia Ramirez

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

901 Main Street, Suite 6000

Dallas, TX 75202

Jennifer Rebecca Bergh

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC

2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Melissa Saldana

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 North Harwood Street

Dallas, TX 75201

W Keith Wier

Attorney at Maurice Wutscher LLP

6136 Frisco Square Blvd, Suite 400

Frisco, TX 75034

Mark Whitney McBrayer

Attorney at Crenshaw Dupree & Milam

Po Box 64479

Lubbock, TX 79464-4479

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Research, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Trust of Dr. John Dillard for Central Research, Inc.. (Wier, W) (Main Document 31 replaced to flatten image on 8/16/2019) (dsr). (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#30

(#30) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by TransUnion LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#29

(#29) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nelnet Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC for Nelnet Servicing LLC. (McBrayer, Mark) (Main Document 29 replaced to flatten image on 8/16/2019) (dsr). (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#28

(#28) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Nelnet Servicing LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McBrayer, Mark) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Settlement with Defendants General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. and Maximus, Inc. (ONLY) filed by Donald Simpson (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#26

(#26) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Central Research, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wier, W) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#24

(#24) ORDER Granting in Part: #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Nelnet Servicing LLC is ordered to file an answer or response by 3:00 PM on 8/16/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/5/2019) (pnp) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#16

(#24) ORDER Granting in Part: #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Nelnet Servicing LLC is ordered to file an answer or response by 3:00 PM on 8/16/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/5/2019) (pnp) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.; served on 7/11/2019. (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; served on 7/11/2019. (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Central Research, Inc.; served on 7/11/2019. (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dsr) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#12

(#25) Pursuant to Special Order 3-331 the clerk is to reassign all cases assigned to Judge Cummings that do not appear on Exhibit A to the docket of US District Judge Wes Hendrix, and all such cases are to carry the suffix letter H. (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/9/2019) (lrl) (lrl) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit(s) Summons to All Defendants

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Donald Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons to All Defendants) (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Donald Simpson. (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#26) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Central Research, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wier, W) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Research, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Trust of Dr. John Dillard for Central Research, Inc.. (Wier, W) (Main Document 31 replaced to flatten image on 8/16/2019) (dsr). (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by TransUnion LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nelnet Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC for Nelnet Servicing LLC. (McBrayer, Mark) (Main Document 29 replaced to flatten image on 8/16/2019) (dsr). (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Nelnet Servicing LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McBrayer, Mark) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Settlement with Defendants General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. and Maximus, Inc. (ONLY) filed by Donald Simpson (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Central Research, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wier, W) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Pursuant to Special Order 3-331 the clerk is to reassign all cases assigned to Judge Cummings that do not appear on Exhibit A to the docket of US District Judge Wes Hendrix, and all such cases are to carry the suffix letter H. (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/9/2019) (lrl) (lrl) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER Granting in Part: #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Nelnet Servicing LLC is ordered to file an answer or response by 3:00 PM on 8/16/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/5/2019) (pnp) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER Granting: #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc. and Maximus, Inc. are ordered to file an answer or respond by 3:00 PM on 8/16/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/5/2019) (pnp) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER Granting: #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Central Research, Inc. Central Research, Inc.'s answer due by 3:00 PM on 8/15/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 8/5/2019) (pnp) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Maximus, Inc. ; served on 7/12/2019. (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC ; served on 7/12/2019. (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nelnet Servicing LLC; served on 7/12/2019. (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to General Dynamics Information Technology, Inc.; served on 7/11/2019. (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.; served on 7/11/2019. (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Central Research, Inc.; served on 7/11/2019. (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dsr) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Donald Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons to All Defendants) (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Donald Simpson. (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Donald Simpson. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10095628) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Adkins, Micah) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.