This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2020 at 10:08:37 (UTC).

Simpson v. Alterra Mountain Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Simpson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Alterra Mountain Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raymond P. Moore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01691

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matt Simpson

Defendants

Alterra Mountain Company

Ikon Pass, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel E. Gustafson

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 South 6Th Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Michael Unthank

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Kathryn A. Reilly

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Natalie Elizabeth West

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Ryan William Cooke

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER. The Joint Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED; Simpson v. Alterra Mountain Co., 20-cv-01691-RM, is hereby consolidated with 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC for pretrial proceedings; all papers in this consolidated action shall be filed in the lowest case number, No. 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC; the parties in the Simpson Action shall participate in the status conference set for June 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. MDT, as set forth in the Orders dated May 26, 2020 (ECF No. 30) and June 4, 2020 (ECF No. 36); and this Order shall also be filed in Civil Action No. 20-cv-01691-RM. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/15/2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by Defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan William Cooke on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Ryan William Cooke added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan William Cooke added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cooke, Ryan) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Natalie Elizabeth West on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Natalie Elizabeth West added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Elizabeth West added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (West, Natalie) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Michael Unthank on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Andrew Michael Unthank added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Michael Unthank added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Unthank, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn A. Reilly on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Kathryn A. Reilly added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn A. Reilly added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

3 #2

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Daniel E. Gustafson added to party Matt Simpson(pty:pla), filed by Matt Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Filing fee: $400, Receipt no: COX095374) (Gustafson, Daniel) Modified to add receipt numbers on 6/10/2020 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER. The Joint Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED; Simpson v. Alterra Mountain Co., 20-cv-01691-RM, is hereby consolidated with 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC for pretrial proceedings; all papers in this consolidated action shall be filed in the lowest case number, No. 20-cv-01057-RM-SKC; the parties in the Simpson Action shall participate in the status conference set for June 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. MDT, as set forth in the Orders dated May 26, 2020 (ECF No. 30) and June 4, 2020 (ECF No. 36); and this Order shall also be filed in Civil Action No. 20-cv-01691-RM. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/15/2020. (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by Defendants Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc. (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan William Cooke on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Ryan William Cooke added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan William Cooke added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cooke, Ryan) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Natalie Elizabeth West on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Natalie Elizabeth West added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Elizabeth West added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (West, Natalie) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Michael Unthank on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Andrew Michael Unthank added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Michael Unthank added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Unthank, Andrew) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn A. Reilly on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Kathryn A. Reilly added to party Alterra Mountain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn A. Reilly added to party Ikon Pass, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reilly, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alterra Mountain Company, Ikon Pass, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Daniel E. Gustafson added to party Matt Simpson(pty:pla), filed by Matt Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Filing fee: $400, Receipt no: COX095374) (Gustafson, Daniel) Modified to add receipt numbers on 6/10/2020 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alterra Mountain Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Ikon Pass, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Michael Unthank