This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2020 at 13:56:13 (UTC).

Simpson v. Advance Stores Company Incorporated

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 Simpson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Advance Stores Company Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is L Scott Coogler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00992

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

L Scott Coogler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kyle Simpson

Defendant

Advance Stores Company Incorporated doing business as Advanced Auto Parts

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David A Hughes

Attorney at HARDIN & HUGHES LLP

2121 14Th Street

Tuscaloosa, AL 35401

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kyle Simpson. Advance Stores Company Incorporated waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Hughes, David) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Kyle Simpson. (Hughes, David) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Advance Stores Company Incorporated, filed by Kyle Simpson.(PSM) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kyle Simpson. Advance Stores Company Incorporated waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Hughes, David) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Kyle Simpson. (Hughes, David) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3628232 (ALND receipt# B4601107145). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Advance Stores Company Incorporated, filed by Kyle Simpson.(PSM). (Hughes, David) Modified on 7/13/2020 (AKD). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Advance Stores Company Incorporated, filed by Kyle Simpson.(PSM) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less