This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2020 at 09:19:26 (UTC).

Simpson et al v. P. F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Simpson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against P F Chang's China Bistro, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis T. Babcock and Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02519

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lewis T. Babcock

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chris Simpson

Sherri Simpson

Defendants

Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.

P. F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.

Safety National Casualty Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott David Smith

Attorney at Taussig & Smith LLC

1873 South Bellaire Street, Suite 400

Denver, CO 80222

Brian Scott MacKenzie

Attorney at MacKenzie Law Firm, P.C.

1873 South Bellaire Street, Suite 400

Denver, CO 80222

Defendant Attorney

Deanne Campbell Ayers

Attorney at Ayers & Ayers

4205 Gateway Drive, Suite 100

Colleyville, TX 76034

 

Court Documents

32 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#32

(#32) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Chris Simpson, Sherri Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Smith, Scott) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#31

(#31) RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines Pending Resolution of A Motion to Remand by Defendants Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., P. F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc., Safety National Casualty Corporation. (Ayers, Deanne) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#29

(#29) STRICKEN ANSWER to #7 Complaint by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc..(Ayers, Deanne) Modified on 9/14/2020 (jgonz, ). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#28

(#28) STRICKEN ANSWER to Complaint by Safety National Casualty Corporation.(Ayers, Deanne) Modified on 9/14/2020 (jgonz, ). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#27

(#27) STRICKEN ANSWER to Complaint by P. F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc..(Ayers, Deanne) Modified on 9/14/2020 (jgonz, ). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#24

(#24) STATE COURT PETITION by Defendant Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

21 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#21

(#31) RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines Pending Resolution of A Motion to Remand by Defendants Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., P. F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc., Safety National Casualty Corporation. (Ayers, Deanne) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

1 #16

Exhibit 16

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #1

Docket Sheet 1

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File and #21 Motion to Stay Case Deadlines. All case deadlines are STAYED until 11/4/2020. On or before that date, the parties shall file a joint status report. by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 09/18/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Chris Simpson, Sherri Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Smith, Scott) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Stay Case Deadlines Pending Resolution of A Motion to Remand by Defendants Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., P. F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc., Safety National Casualty Corporation. (Ayers, Deanne) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE ORDER re: #27 Answer to Complaint filed by P. F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc., #28 Answer to Complaint filed by Safety National Casualty Corporation, #29 Answer to Complaint filed by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., #24 State Court Petition filed by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. These filing are STRICKEN as duplicate pleadings. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 09/11/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STRICKEN ANSWER to #7 Complaint by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc..(Ayers, Deanne) Modified on 9/14/2020 (jgonz, ). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) STRICKEN ANSWER to Complaint by Safety National Casualty Corporation.(Ayers, Deanne) Modified on 9/14/2020 (jgonz, ). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STRICKEN ANSWER to Complaint by P. F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc..(Ayers, Deanne) Modified on 9/14/2020 (jgonz, ). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., P. F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Safety National Casualty Corporation. (Ayers, Deanne) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STATE COURT PETITION by Defendant Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Safety National Casualty Corporation on 07/30/2020. (trvo, ) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon P.F. Chang's China Bistro on 07/30/2020. (trvo, ) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. on 07/30/2020. (trvo, ) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., P. F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc., Safety National Casualty Corporation, filed by Sherri Simpson, Chris Simpson.(trvo, ) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#5) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, ) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE Consent to Removal by Defendant Safety National Casualty Corporation (Ayers, Deanne) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Consent to Removal by Defendant P. F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. (Ayers, Deanne) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Arthur J. Gallagher & Company for GallagherBassett Services, Inc.. (Ayers, Deanne) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GallagherBassett Services, Inc. from District Court of Boulder County, Colorado, Case Number 2020CV30472. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7448845), filed by GallagherBassett Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Ayers, Deanne) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safety National Casualty Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where P.F. CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Gallagher Bassett Services is a litigant