This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2020 at 09:14:45 (UTC).

SimplyFresco, LLC v. La Tortilla Factory Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 SimplyFresco, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against La Tortilla Factory Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Fred Biery. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00893

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred Biery

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

SimplyFresco, LLC

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff

La Tortilla Factory Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Nicholas Adam Guinn

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Natalie Marguerite Cooley

Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A - I

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

12 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim SIMPLYFRESCO'S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS by SimplyFresco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Guinn, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Courtwithin the earlier of 90 days after any defendant has been served or 60 days after any defendant has appeared.., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (mgr) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez on behalf of La Tortilla Factory Inc.. Attorney Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez added to party La Tortilla Factory Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez added to party La Tortilla Factory Inc.(pty:dft) (Dominguez, Adrienne) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Marguerite Cooley on behalf of La Tortilla Factory Inc. (Cooley, Natalie) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by La Tortilla Factory Inc.. (Cooley, Natalie) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) La Tortilla Factory Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Natalie Marguerite Cooley added to party La Tortilla Factory Inc.(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against SimplyFresco, LLC by La Tortilla Factory Inc..(Cooley, Natalie) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SimplyFresco, LLC. La Tortilla Factory Inc. served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Guinn, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to La Tortilla Factory Inc. (rg) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rg) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2020

DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney. (rg) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2020

DocketCase assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rg) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SimplyFresco, LLC. (Guinn, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by SimplyFresco, LLC. (Guinn, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13822558), filed by SimplyFresco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - I)(Guinn, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less