This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2020 at 08:30:37 (UTC).

SimpleAir, Inc. v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 SimpleAir, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02839

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SimpleAir, Inc.

Defendant

Google LLC

Not Classified By Court

Hon. David Folsom

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Jeffrey Eichmann

Simon Franzini

Defendant Attorneys

Deepa Acharya

Carl G Anderson

Jordan R Jaffe

Lindsay M Cooper

James DuBois Judah

Michelle Ann Clark

Michael D Powell

Patrick Daniel Curran

Charles K Verhoeven

 

Court Documents

#123

120 #17

Exhibit O

120 #16

Exhibit N

120 #15

Exhibit M

120 #14

Exhibit L

120 #12

Exhibit J

120 #10

Exhibit H

120 #8

Exhibit F

120 #7

Exhibit E

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - '838 Paent

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - '048 Patent

#1

333 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) #120 filed by Plaintiff SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Goodrich declaration)(Eichmann, John) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO AMEND PLEADINGS AND ADD PARTIES (DKT. #121 ; DKT. 110) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Stipulation is GRANTED IN PART and the deadline to amend or add parties is continued to a date that will be set in the order on the pending motions to dismiss brought by Google LLC. No. 2:20-cv-02839 JAK (PLAx), Dkt. 120; No. 2:16-cv-03758 JAK (PLAx), Dkt. 109. (yl) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Defendant Google Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jordan R. Jaffe)(Jaffe, Jordan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(c) filed by Defendant Google Inc., Google LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/22/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Deepa Acharya, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (cause or other),, #17 filed by Defendant Google Inc., Google LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed the parties' 4/102020 Joint Report #116 and sets the following deadlines: Deadline for Google to File Opening Brief: 5/1/2020. Last day to amend or add parties: 5/11/2020. Deadline for Google to serve invalidity contentions: 5/22/2020. Opposition to Google's Consolidated Rule 12(c) Motion(not to exceed 30 pages): 5/22/2020. Reply as to Google's Consolidated Rule 12(c) Motion (not to exceed 15 pages): 6/1/2020. Parties to exchange proposed terms for construction: 6/8/2020. Hearing on Google's Consolidated Rule 12(c) Motion: 6/22/2020 at 8:30 AM. Parties to exchange proposed constructions and evidence: 6/22/2020. Claim Construction Discovery Cut-Off: 7/31/2020. Last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation with a private neutral: 8/7/2020. Last day to file a notice of settlement or a joint report re status of settlement: 8/14/2020. Joint Markman Prehearing Statement Due: 8/12/2020. Simultaneous Opening Markman Briefs Due: 8/28/2020. Simultaneous Responsive Markman Briefs, Tutorials, and Presentation Materials Due: 9/11/2020. Markman Hearing/Post Mediation Status Conference: 10/5/2020 at 10:30 AM. Anticipated Ruling to be Issued on Markman Issues: 10/26/2020. SimpleAir's Deadline to Serve Final Infringement Contentions, Expert Reports on issues Where Patentee has Burden of Proof, All Parties Serve Advice of Counsel Disclosures: 11/23/2020. Google's Deadline to Serve Final Invalidity Contentions, Rebuttal Expert Reports, and Opening Expert Reports Where Accused Infringer has Burden of Proof: 12/21/2020. SimpleAir's Deadline to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports on Issues Where Accused Infringer has Burden of Proof: 1/19/2021. Last day to file motions (including discovery motions): 2/16/2020. (jp) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than August 7, 2020. Report due August 14, 2020. Post Mediation Status Conference set for October 5, 2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (cw) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan / Rule 16(b) report ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff SimpleAir, Inc... (Eichmann, John) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Sidney Calvin Capshaw John Jeffrey Eichmann on behalf of Plaintiff SimpleAir, Inc.. RE: dkt 107. PHV fee n/a. (Eichmann, John) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Elizabeth DeRieux John Jeffrey Eichmann on behalf of Plaintiff SimpleAir, Inc.. RE: dkt 106. PHV fee n/a. (Eichmann, John) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Simon Carlo Franzini on behalf of SimpleAir, Inc. (Franzini, Simon) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SimpleAir, Inc.. Google Inc. served on 4/11/2016, answer due 5/2/2016. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/12/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/12/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Google Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/11/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of SimpleAir, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Eichmann, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SimpleAir, Inc. (Eichmann, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5696054.), filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - '048 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2 - '838 Paent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eichmann, John) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less