This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2023 at 09:03:25 (UTC).

Simon v. Shell Exploration & Production Company

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 Simon filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Shell Exploration Production Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-04459

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JARROD SIMON

Defendant

Shell Exploration & Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregg M Rosenberg

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/12/2023 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(HeatherCarr, 4) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jarrod Simon, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jarrod Simon served on 1/4/2023, answer due 3/6/2023, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketThe above entitled action is assigned to United States District Judge George C. Hanks, Jr. Attorneys and Pro Se individuals are responsible for complying with this Court's rules and procedures, specifically, under Rule 6. Motion Practice. B. Pre-Motion Conferences Required for Particular Motions. Please download and review the individual practices of the assigned District Judge, located at: https://www.txs.uscourts.gov/sites/txs/files/GCH_Court_Procedures.pdf. (Note: If clicking the link does not work, you can copy/paste the url into your web browser address bar to view the procedures.) (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 4/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (rcastro, 3) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jarrod Simon served on 1/4/2023, answer due 3/6/2023, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jarrod Simon, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/12/2023 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(HeatherCarr, 4) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Shell Exploration & Production Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29238544) filed by JARROD SIMON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less