This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:25:58 (UTC).

SIMON v. SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 SIMON filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia G. Cooke and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-21901

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MANUEL SIMON

Brandon Tuyuc

Matusalen Emmanuel Samael

Luis Carlos Villalob Lopez

Defendants

CERRONI ENGINEERING LLC

VALERIO CERRON

SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC

UWE CERRON

CERRONI ENGINEERING LLC doing business as Selenis Construction

SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC doing business as Selenis Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ruben Martin Saenz

Attorney at Saenz & Anderson, PLLC

20900 N.E. 30Th Avenue, Suite 800

Aventura, FL 33180

Yadhira Ramirez-Toro

500 S. Federal Highway, Suite 1058

Hallandale Beach, FL 33009

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Ruben Martin Saenz on behalf of MANUEL SIMON (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MANUEL SIMON. SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MANUEL SIMON. CERRONI ENGINEERING LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MANUEL SIMON. VALERIO CERRON served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#9

(#9) Statement of: claim by MANUEL SIMON re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Set/Reset Deadlines, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yadhira Ramirez-Toro on behalf of MANUEL SIMON. Attorney Yadhira Ramirez-Toro added to party MANUEL SIMON(pty:pla). (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#7

(#7) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by MANUEL SIMON (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MANUEL SIMON (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (kou) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to UWE CERRON, VALERIO CERRON, CERRONI ENGINEERING LLC, SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (amb) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

1 #5

Summon(s)

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12848787, filed by MANUEL SIMON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Luis Carlos Villalobos Lopez, Matusalen Emmanuel Samael, Brandon Tuyuc. SEE DE #13 NOTICE OF CONSENT (ail) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Ruben Martin Saenz on behalf of MANUEL SIMON (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MANUEL SIMON. SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MANUEL SIMON. CERRONI ENGINEERING LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MANUEL SIMON. VALERIO CERRON served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of: claim by MANUEL SIMON re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Set/Reset Deadlines, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yadhira Ramirez-Toro on behalf of MANUEL SIMON. Attorney Yadhira Ramirez-Toro added to party MANUEL SIMON(pty:pla). (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by MANUEL SIMON (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MANUEL SIMON (Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Docket(#5) ENDORSED ORDER Regarding Phone Calls to Chambers. The following rules apply in this and all other civil matters pending before Judge Marcia G. Cooke: 1. Do not call Chambers to ask about the status of pending motions, including motions for extension of time. The Court is aware of all pending motions and will address each of them in due course. 2. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek, or seek to provide, can be conveyed through a filing on the docket. 3. Do not call Chambers if the information you seek is available from other sources, including Court Orders and the Local Rules. 4. If you call Chambers for a permissible purpose, counsel for all affected parties must be on the line. Calls from non-attorneys and ex parte calls will not be accepted. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/7/2020. (kou) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (kou) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to UWE CERRON, VALERIO CERRON, CERRONI ENGINEERING LLC, SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (amb) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12848787, filed by MANUEL SIMON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s))(Saenz, Ruben) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELENIS TECHNOLOGIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yadhira Ramirez-Toro

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruben Martin Saenz