This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2020 at 08:58:53 (UTC).

Simon Property Group, LP v American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Simon Property Group, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00267

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Simon Property Group, LP

Defendants

American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc

U.S. Bank National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mariah Leigh Hornok

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100

Texarkana, TX 75503

Jennifer Haltom Doan

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100

Texarkana, TX 75503

Kyle Randall Akin

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100

Texarkana, TX 75503

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Hugh Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft PC

102 N College Avenue, Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Roger Brian Craft

Attorney at Findlay Craft PC

102 N College Avenue, Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

Sanjiv Prakash Laud

Attorney at Jones Day - Minneapolis

90 South 7Th Street, Suite 4950

Minneapolis, MN 55402

John Thomas Vitt

Attorney at Jones Day - Minneapolis

90 South 7Th Street, Suite 4950

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Pa Nhia Vang

Attorney at Jones Day - Minneapolis

90 South 7Th Street, Suite 4950

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#21

20 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#20

#19

#18

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#17

#16

#15

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Summons(es)

#2

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/9/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Simon Property Group, LP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting as modified #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/3/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to John Thomas Vitt on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Vitt, John) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Laud, Sanjiv) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for U.S. Bank National Association. Deadline 10/9/2020 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re U.S. Bank National Association.( Laud, Sanjiv) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. Deadline 10/9/2020 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.( Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REDACTION to #1 Sealed Document, COMPLAINT by Simon Property Group, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Simon Property Group, LP (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Simon Property Group, LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Simon Property Group, LP. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Randall Akin on behalf of Simon Property Group, LP (Akin, Kyle) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mariah Leigh Hornok on behalf of Simon Property Group, LP (Hornok, Mariah) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Simon Property Group, LP (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Sealed Document - Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Receipt 600053749 for 400.00 filing fee) (ch, ) Modified on 8/17/2020 (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #5 Civil Cover Sheet Corrected) (ch, ). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Travel Related Svcs Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Simon Property Goup LP is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle Randall Akin