This case was last updated from PACER on 02/12/2020 at 07:01:55 (UTC).

Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc. v. Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2019 Simon J Burchett Photography, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11470

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.

Defendant

Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard M Garbarini

Attorney at Garbarini FitzGerald P.C.

250 Park Avenue, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10177

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.. (dnh) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/4/2020) (gr) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 12/14/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/16/2019) (gr) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Assignment

#6

(#6) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dnh) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#4

(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 12/14/2019)

#9

(#9) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 02/03/2020 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dt) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Registration

1 #3

Exhibit Notice

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18281041)Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration, #2 Exhibit Assignment, #3 Exhibit Notice)(Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 12/14/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 12/14/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/4/2020) (gr) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 02/03/2020 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dt) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/16/2019) (gr) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (dnh) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.. (dnh) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 12/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 12/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 12/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Simmons-Boardman Publishing Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18281041)Document filed by Simon J. Burchett Photography, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration, #2 Exhibit Assignment, #3 Exhibit Notice)(Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 12/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.