This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2021 at 08:10:07 (UTC).

Simmons v. Kohl's Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 Simmons filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kohl's Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Iain D. Johnston and Margaret J. Schneider. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-50375

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Iain D. Johnston

Referral Judge

Margaret J. Schneider

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lanita Simmons

Defendants

Kohl's Inc.

KIN, INC.

Kohl's Illinois, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Philip Justen

Attorney at The Law Office of Kevin P. Justen, P.C.

413 N. Front Street

Mchenry, IL 60050

Defendant Attorney

Gregory T Glen

Attorney at Kopka Pinkus Dolin PC

200 West Adams, Suite 1200

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lanita Simmons as to Kohl's Inc. on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lanita Simmons as to Kohl's Illinois, Inc. on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lanita Simmons as to KIN, INC. on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Initial telephonic status hearing set for 11/10/21 at 9:45 a.m. The Court will be utilizing the Cisco Webex platform. Public access is available via the following call-in number: 1-(650)-479-3207 and enter ACCESS CODE: 180-822-8235#. Plaintiff and lead defense counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear at the initial status hearing. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Schneider's webpage and file by 11/03/21. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Counsel of record will receive an email the day prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants KIN, INC., Kohl's Illinois, Inc., Kohl's Inc. by Gregory T Glen (Glen, Gregory) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#9

(#9) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by KIN, INC., Kohl's Illinois, Inc., Kohl's Inc.(Glen, Gregory) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#10

(#10) Western Division ADR Notification (jp, ) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#11

(#11) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Lanita Simmons (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#12

(#12) Letter to Judge by KIN, INC., Kohl's Illinois, Inc., Kohl's Inc. (Glen, Gregory) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Telephonic initial status conference held on 11/10/21. By 11/19/21, the parties shall file a joint proposed case management order using the order form located on Judge Schneider's webpage. The Court will set further dates following receipt of the proposed case management order. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#14

(#14) PROPOSED Case Management Order by Lanita Simmons (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: The Court is in receipt of the parties' proposed case management order #14 , which is adopted as modified as follows: R. 26(a)(1) disclosures will be exchanged by 12/10/21; 30 interrogatories by each party to any other party; 28 requests for admission by each party to any other party; 6 depositions by Plaintiff and 6 by Defendants, limited to 7 hours unless extended by agreement of the parties; amended pleadings, new counts or parties, and third-party complaints due by 04/01/22; Rule 26(a)(2)(C) disclosures due by 03/15/22; Rule 26(e) supplements due by 04/01/22; and fact discovery ends 05/02/22. The deadlines for expert discovery and dispositive motions are reserved. By 12/20/21, the parties shall file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of discovery and any settlement discussions. The parties should contact the Court's Operations Specialist, Jillian Kopecky, if a settlement conference is desired.Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: The Court is in receipt of the parties' proposed case management order #14 , which is adopted as modified as follows: R. 26(a)(1) disclosures will be exchanged by 12/10/21; 30 interrogatories by each party to any other party; 28 requests for admission by each party to any other party; 6 depositions by Plaintiff and 6 by Defendants, limited to 7 hours unless extended by agreement of the parties; amended pleadings, new counts or parties, and third-party complaints due by 04/01/22; Rule 26(a)(2)(C) disclosures due by 03/15/22; Rule 26(e) supplements due by 04/01/22; and fact discovery ends 05/02/22. The deadlines for expert discovery and dispositive motions are reserved. By 12/20/21, the parties shall file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of discovery and any settlement discussions. The parties should contact the Court's Operations Specialist, Jillian Kopecky, if a settlement conference is desired.Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROPOSED Case Management Order by Lanita Simmons (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Telephonic initial status conference held on 11/10/21. By 11/19/21, the parties shall file a joint proposed case management order using the order form located on Judge Schneider's webpage. The Court will set further dates following receipt of the proposed case management order. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter to Judge by KIN, INC., Kohl's Illinois, Inc., Kohl's Inc. (Glen, Gregory) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Lanita Simmons (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Western Division ADR Notification (jp, ) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by KIN, INC., Kohl's Illinois, Inc., Kohl's Inc.(Glen, Gregory) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants KIN, INC., Kohl's Illinois, Inc., Kohl's Inc. by Gregory T Glen (Glen, Gregory) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider: Initial telephonic status hearing set for 11/10/21 at 9:45 a.m. The Court will be utilizing the Cisco Webex platform. Public access is available via the following call-in number: 1-(650)-479-3207 and enter ACCESS CODE: 180-822-8235#. Plaintiff and lead defense counsel with full knowledge of the case must appear at the initial status hearing. The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Schneider's webpage and file by 11/03/21. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Counsel of record will receive an email the day prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions. Mailed notice. (jxk) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lanita Simmons as to KIN, INC. on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lanita Simmons as to Kohl's Illinois, Inc. on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lanita Simmons as to Kohl's Inc. on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants KIN, INC., Kohl's Illinois, Inc., Kohl's Inc. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Iain D. Johnston and Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Margaret J. Schneider. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lanita Simmons by Kevin Philip Justen (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Lanita Simmons; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18724298.(Justen, Kevin) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kohls of Illinois is a litigant

Latest cases where Kin, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kohls Corp is a litigant