This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 07:10:12 (UTC).

SIMMONS v. DOLLAR BANK FSB et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 SIMMONS filed a Finance - Banking lawsuit against DOLLAR BANK FSB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen P. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01039

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Banking

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maureen P. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDRY SIMMONS, JR.

Defendants

DOLLAR BANK FSB

DOES 1 THROUGH 5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elaine Kusel

Attorney at McCune Wright Aravelo

3821 E. Gausti Road, Suite 100

Ontario, CA 91761

Richard Dale McCune, Jr

Attorney at McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP

3281 East Guasti Road, Suite 100

Ontario, CA 91761

Sherief Morsy

Attorney at McCune Wright Arevalo LLP

One Gateway Center, Suite 2600

Newark, NJ 07102

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew J Demko

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

John R. O'Keefe, Jr.

Attorney at Metz Lewis Brodman Must O'Keefe LLC

535 Smithfield Street, Suite 800

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

12 #2

Proposed Order

12 #1

Affidavit of Andrew J. Demko

#12

#10

#9

#8

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Affidavit

#7

#6

#5

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Affidavit

#4

#3

#2

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DOLLAR BANK FSB. (O'Keefe, John) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Andrew J. Demko to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 9/13/2021. (et) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for attorney Andrew J. Demko to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6702482) by DOLLAR BANK FSB. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew J. Demko, #2 Proposed Order) (Demko, Andrew) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer filed by DOLLAR BANK FSB; Defendant Dollar Bank, Federal Savings Bank, shall Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 8, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 9/1/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ndf) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by DOLLAR BANK FSB Answer due from DOLLAR BANK FSB on 11/8/2021. (O'Keefe, John) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John R. O'Keefe, Jr on behalf of DOLLAR BANK FSB. (O'Keefe, John) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Sherief Morsy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 8/23/2021. (et) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for attorney Sherief Morsy to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6670003), by LANDRY SIMMONS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Morsy, Sherief) Modified text on 8/24/2021. (ndf) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Richard D. McCune to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 8/19/2021. (et) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LANDRY SIMMONS, JR. DOLLAR BANK FSB served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Kusel, Elaine) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for attorney Richard D. McCune to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6664611) by LANDRY SIMMONS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (McCune, Richard) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 8/10/2021. (et) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to DOLLAR BANK FSB (jd) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DOES 1 THROUGH 5, DOLLAR BANK FSB (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6642764), filed by LANDRY SIMMONS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less