This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 at 07:44:16 (UTC).

Simmons v. CoreCivic, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Simmons filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CoreCivic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00234

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charlotte Simmons

Defendants

James Yates

CoreCivic, Inc.

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel E. Smolen

Attorney at Smolen & Roytman, PLLC

701 S Cincinnati Ave

Tulsa, OK 74119

Robert M. Blakemore

Attorney at Smolen & Roytman, PLLC

701 S Cincinnati Ave

Tulsa, OK 74119

Defendant Attorney

Darrell L. Moore

Attorney at J. Ralph Moore, PC

Po Box 368

Pryor, OK 74362

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting hearing(s): Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Settlement Conference Statements due 4/22/2020. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 9/27/2019. Exhibit List due by 3/27/2020. Witness List due by 3/27/2020. Discovery due by 4/27/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2020. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 5/29/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Jury Trial set for 6/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Additionally, the Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 10:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#12

(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Charlotte Simmons [NOTE: Attorney Robert M. Blakemore added to party Charlotte Simmons(pty:pla)]. (Blakemore, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim) by Charlotte Simmons (Smolen, Daniel) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

10 #1

Consent or Reassignment Form

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 9/13/2019 at 10:15 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to submit Joint Status Report by 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by CoreCivic, Inc., James Yates Responses due by 9/3/2019(Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrell L. Moore on behalf of CoreCivic, Inc., James Yates (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: James Yates - Served on 8/5/2019. by Charlotte Simmons (Smolen, Daniel) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CoreCivic, Inc. - Served on 8/2/2019. by Charlotte Simmons (Smolen, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to James Yates (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CoreCivic, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/29/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CoreCivic, Inc., Does 1-10, James Yates by Charlotte Simmons (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Charlotte Simmons (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting hearing(s): Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Settlement Conference Statements due 4/22/2020. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 9/27/2019. Exhibit List due by 3/27/2020. Witness List due by 3/27/2020. Discovery due by 4/27/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2020. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 5/29/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Jury Trial set for 6/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Additionally, the Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 10:15 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Charlotte Simmons [NOTE: Attorney Robert M. Blakemore added to party Charlotte Simmons(pty:pla)]. (Blakemore, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim) by Charlotte Simmons (Smolen, Daniel) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 9/13/2019 at 10:15 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to submit Joint Status Report by 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent or Reassignment Form) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by CoreCivic, Inc., James Yates Responses due by 9/3/2019(Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrell L. Moore on behalf of CoreCivic, Inc., James Yates (Moore, Darrell) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: James Yates - Served on 8/5/2019. by Charlotte Simmons (Smolen, Daniel) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: CoreCivic, Inc. - Served on 8/2/2019. by Charlotte Simmons (Smolen, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to James Yates (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to CoreCivic, Inc. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/22/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1282662 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Charlotte Simmons (Smolen, Daniel) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/29/2019) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CoreCivic, Inc., Does 1-10, James Yates by Charlotte Simmons (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Charlotte Simmons (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less