This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:05:33 (UTC).

Simmons et al v. K & E Resources et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Simmons filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against K E Resources. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eldon E. Fallon and Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14040

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

Referral Judge

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thelma Cosby

Carl Simmons

Defendants

Jane Easterly Achord

K & E Resources

K & E Resources LLC

Jane Ola Easterly Achord

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Preston Lee Hayes

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Ryan Paul Monsour

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Zachary Rhys Smith

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Whitaker

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP (New Orleans)

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Erin Lutkewitte Kilgore

Attorney at Kean Miller, LLP (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention St., Suite 700, Po Box 3513 (70821-3513)

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Arthur Edward Hardin, Jr.

Attorney at Kean Miller, LLP (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention St., Suite 700, Po Box 3513 (70821-3513)

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Chelsea Gomez Caswell

Attorney at Kean Miller, LLP (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention St., Suite 700, Po Box 3513 (70821-3513)

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jane Ola Easterly Achord served on 12/8/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Hayes, Preston) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (jls). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Request of Summons Issued as to Jane Easterly Achord filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Hayes, Preston) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/6/2019) (jeg). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) **DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jane Ola Easterly Achord served on 12/8/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Hayes, Preston) Modified on 12/11/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order

1 #2

Exhibit

#13

(#13) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 20, 2020, at 10:30AM, for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. The Court will initiate the call. By Clerk.(jeg) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #1

Complaint

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses by Jane Ola Easterly Achord, K & E Resources LLC.(Hardin, Arthur) Modified text on 1/22/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Jane Easterly Achord, K & E Resources. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jeg) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jane Easterly Achord, K & E Resources (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8007055) filed by Thelma Cosby, Carl Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)Attorney Preston Lee Hayes added to party Thelma Cosby(pty:pla), Attorney Preston Lee Hayes added to party Carl Simmons(pty:pla).(Hayes, Preston) (Main Document 1 and Attachment 1 replaced on 12/5/2019) (jeg). Modified text on 12/5/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit

5 #1

Summons

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed; K & E Resources LLC served on 12/8/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Hayes, Preston) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#9

(#9) EX PARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Jane Ola Easterly Achord, K & E Resources LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Arthur Edward Hardin, Jr added to party Jane Ola Easterly Achord(pty:dft), Attorney Arthur Edward Hardin, Jr added to party K & E Resources LLC(pty:dft).(Hardin, Arthur) Modified text/removed referral on 12/30/2019 (jls). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#3

(#3) Request of Summons Issued as to K & E Resources filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Hayes, Preston) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/6/2019) (jeg). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 20, 2020, at 10:30AM, for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. The Court will initiate the call. By Clerk.(jeg) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses by Jane Ola Easterly Achord, K & E Resources LLC.(Hardin, Arthur) Modified text on 1/22/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Jane Ola Easterly Achord and K & E Resources LLC - answers now due by 1/20/2020. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/2/20. (dno) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. **Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (jls) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EX PARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Jane Ola Easterly Achord, K & E Resources LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Arthur Edward Hardin, Jr added to party Jane Ola Easterly Achord(pty:dft), Attorney Arthur Edward Hardin, Jr added to party K & E Resources LLC(pty:dft).(Hardin, Arthur) Modified text/removed referral on 12/30/2019 (jls). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jane Ola Easterly Achord served on 12/8/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Hayes, Preston) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (jls). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed; K & E Resources LLC served on 12/8/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Hayes, Preston) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; Jane Ola Easterly Achord served on 12/8/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Hayes, Preston) Modified on 12/11/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Jane Easterly Achord, K & E Resources. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jeg) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request of Summons Issued as to K & E Resources filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Hayes, Preston) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/6/2019) (jeg). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request of Summons Issued as to Jane Easterly Achord filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint. (Hayes, Preston) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/6/2019) (jeg). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jane Easterly Achord, K & E Resources (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8007055) filed by Thelma Cosby, Carl Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)Attorney Preston Lee Hayes added to party Thelma Cosby(pty:pla), Attorney Preston Lee Hayes added to party Carl Simmons(pty:pla).(Hayes, Preston) (Main Document 1 and Attachment 1 replaced on 12/5/2019) (jeg). Modified text on 12/5/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.