This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2019 at 07:26:48 (UTC).

Simmons et al v. Cachet Financial Services et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Simmons filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Cachet Financial Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kent J. Dawson, Cam Ferenbach and Gloria M. Navarro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01624

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

Presiding Judges

Kent J. Dawson

Gloria M. Navarro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aaron McAllister

Sarah Simmons

Roi-It, LLC

Defendants

Michael Mann

Mypayrollhr LLC

National Payment Corporation

Financial Business Group Holdings

Valuewise Corp.

Cloud Payroll, LLC

Cachet Financial Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher D Kircher

Attorney at Semenza Kircher Rickard

10161 Park Run Dr., Ste. 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Jarrod L. Rickard

Attorney at Semenza Kircher Rickard

10161 Park Run Drive, Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Lawrence J Semenza, III

Attorney at Semenza Kircher Rickard

10161 Park Run Drive, Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Katie Lynn Cannata

Attorney at Semenza Kircher Rickard

10161 Park Run Drive, Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel R McNutt

Attorney at McNutt Law Firm, P.C.

625 South Eighth Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Terry D. Garnett

Attorney at PAUL HASTINGS, JANOFSKY& WALKER

515 South Flower St. 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2228

Donald A. Miller

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb, LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd Ste 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Matthew C Wolf

Attorney at McNutt Law Firm, P.C.

625 South 8Th Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

11 #9

Exhibit 8

11 #7

Exhibit 6

11 #6

Exhibit 5

11 #4

Exhibit 3

11 #3

Exhibit 2

11 #2

Exhibit 1

11 #1

Declaration Donald Miller Declaration

#2

1 #8

Summons Myparollhr

1 #7

Summons Valuewise

1 #6

Summons National Payment Corp

1 #4

Summons Cloud Payroll

1 #3

Summons FBGH

1 #2

Summons Cachet Financial

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER Granting #26 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Terry D. Garnett and approving Attorney Dan McNutt as Designation of Local Counsel for Cachet Financial Services and Financial Business Group Holdings. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/30/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Terry Garnett and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Daniel McNutt (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5757046) by Defendants Cachet Financial Services, Financial Business Group Holdings. (McNutt, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing re emergency motion for extension of time #11 held on 10/25/2019 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries; Pla Counsel: Katie Cannata and appearing telephoically Lawrence Semenza; Def Counsel: Matthew Wolf and appearing teleponically Donald Miller; Recording start and end times: 11:00 - 11:11; Courtroom: 3D; The court canvasses and hears representations from the parties. ORDERED emergency motion for extension of time #11 is GRANTED to the extent answer/response to the complaint is due 11/18/19. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/24/2019. By Deputy Clerk: J. Ries. ORDERED motion for leave to appear telephonically #23 is GRANTED. The call-in telephone number is (888) 273-3658, access code: 3912597. The call must be made five minutes prior to the hearing time. The court will join the call and convene the proceedings. The call must be made on a land line. The use of cell phone or speaker phone during the proceeding is prohibited. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically re: #13 ORDER - Motion Hearing; filed by Defendant Cachet Financial Services. (Wolf, Matthew) Document not filed pursuant to the local rules by attorney Matthew C Wolf. Court corrected entry on 10/24/2019 (RFJ). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER Granting #20 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Donald A. Miller and approving Attorney Daniel R. McNutt as Designation of Local Counsel for Cachet Financial Services and Financial Business Group Holdings. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/23/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roi-It, LLC, Aaron McAllister, Sarah Simmons. Michael Mann served on 10/12/2019, answer due 11/2/2019. (Semenza, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Donald Miller and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Daniel McNutt (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5747191) by Defendants Cachet Financial Services, Financial Business Group Holdings. (McNutt, Daniel) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roi-It, LLC, Aaron McAllister, Sarah Simmons. Cloud Payroll, LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Semenza, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roi-It, LLC, Aaron McAllister, Sarah Simmons. Mypayrollhr LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Semenza, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roi-It, LLC, Aaron McAllister, Sarah Simmons re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Financial Business Group Holdings served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Semenza, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roi-It, LLC, Aaron McAllister, Sarah Simmons re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Cachet Financial Services served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Semenza, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#7) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01624-GMN-VCF. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/1/2019. By Deputy Clerk: D. Saavedra. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • (#4) (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Katie L. Cannata is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (SLD) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Aaron McAllister, Roi-It, LLC, Sarah Simmons. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Semenza, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5702675) by ROI-IT, LLC, Aaron McAllister, Sarah Simmons. Proof of service due by 12/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cachet Financial, #3 Summons FBGH, #4 Summons Cloud Payroll, #5 Summons Michael Mann, #6 Summons National Payment Corp, #7 Summons Valuewise, #8 Summons Myparollhr)(Semenza, Lawrence) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cachet Financial Services is a litigant

Latest cases where National Payment Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Cloud Payroll, LLC is a litigant