This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2022 at 08:46:59 (UTC).

Simien v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Simien filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02247

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judy Simien

Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul J Cox

Attorney at Cox Cox et al

723 Broad St

Lake Charles, LA 70601

Defendant Attorneys

Peyton Robertson

Attorney at Law Office of Peyton Robertson

1123 Pithon St

Lake Charles, LA 70601

Christopher P Ieyoub

Attorney at Plauche' Smith & Nieset

P O Drawer 1705

Lake Charles, LA 70602

V Ed McGuire, III

Attorney at Plauche' Smith & Nieset

P O Drawer 1705

Lake Charles, LA 70602

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Judy Simien. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (aty,Cox, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint with consent sought but not yet obtained by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Peyton Robertson added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Robertson, Peyton) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

5 #1

Proposed order

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Other Affiliate State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Robertson, Peyton) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 9/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/15/2022. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Robertson, Peyton) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Robertson, Peyton) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 9/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/15/2022. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co identifying Other Affiliate State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co for State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (aty,Robertson, Peyton) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint with consent sought but not yet obtained by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Peyton Robertson added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Co(pty:dft))(aty,Robertson, Peyton) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Judy Simien. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (aty,Cox, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire & Casualty Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5189212) filed by Judy Simien. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Paul J Cox added to party Judy Simien(pty:pla))(aty,Cox, Paul) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant