This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2022 at 09:06:48 (UTC).

Simeus v. Walmart Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 Simeus filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Badalamenti and Kyle C. Dudek. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00586

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Badalamenti

Referral Judge

Kyle C. Dudek

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELVIE SIMEUS

Defendant

WALMART INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tanesha Walls Blye

Attorney at Saenz and Anderson, PLLC

20900 N.E. 30Th Avenue, Suite 800

Aventura, FL 33180

Juliana Velasquez Cortes

Attorney at Saenz & Anderson PLLC

20900 Ne 30Th Ave Ste 800

Aventura, FL 33180

Ruben Martin Saenz

Attorney at Saenz & Anderson, PLLC

20900 Ne 30Th Avenue, Suite 800

Aventura, FL 33180

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Walmart Inc. (SPB) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/19/2022. (SPB) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2022 by Elvie Simeus as to Walmart Inc. (Blye, Tanesha) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Civil Action Order by Elvie Simeus. (Blye, Tanesha) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Elvie Simeus. Related case(s): Yes (Blye, Tanesha) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Elvie Simeus. Related case(s): Yes (Blye, Tanesha) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Civil Action Order by Elvie Simeus. (Blye, Tanesha) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2022 by Elvie Simeus as to Walmart Inc. (Blye, Tanesha) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/19/2022. (SPB) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Walmart Inc. (SPB) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:22-cv-0586-JLB-KCD. (SJB) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19997398) filed by Elvie Simeus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Blye, Tanesha) Modified on 9/19/2022, to edit docket text. (SPB). (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tanesha Walls Blye

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juliana Cortes