This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2022 at 12:46:25 (UTC).

Simans v. Southern Credit Burearu Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 Simans filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Southern Credit Burearu Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Harold L. Murphy and Walter E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00188

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harold L. Murphy

Referral Judge

Walter E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Berry Simans

Defendant

Southern Credit Burearu Corporation doing business as Credit Bureau Associates

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Neil Armor

Attorney at Armor Law, LLC

P.O. Box 451328

Atlanta, GA 31145

Matthew Thomas Berry

Attorney at Berry & Associates, P.C.

Suite 600, 2751 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Michael Berry Simans. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#3

(#3) Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by District Judge Harold L. Murphy (tmf) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Berry Simans. Southern Credit Burearu Corporation waiver mailed on 8/29/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Berry Simans. Southern Credit Burearu Corporation waiver mailed on 8/29/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by District Judge Harold L. Murphy (tmf) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Michael Berry Simans. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Michael Berry Simans. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12022578) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern Credit Bureau Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Neil Armor