This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2022 at 09:34:57 (UTC).

Silvestri v. Federal Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Silvestri filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Federal Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy W. Berger and Gregory J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01957

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evelyn Silvestri

Defendant

Federal Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Stephen Burke

Attorney at Dicus & Burke, PLLC

575 2Nd Ave S Ste 201

St. Petersburg, FL 33701-4166

Wesley Clayton Dicus, Sr.

Attorney at Dicus & Burke, PLLC

575 2Nd Ave S Ste 201

St. Petersburg, FL 33701-4166

Defendant Attorney

Michael James Raudebaugh

Attorney at Clausen Miller PC

4830 West Kennedy Blvd., Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2021-CA-009733-O filed in State Court on 10/05/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18947119 filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C State Court Docket and Record, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raudebaugh, Michael) Modified text on 11/19/2021 (BD). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Docket and Record

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Federal Insurance Company.(Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/29/2021. (MB) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 2 Case Assigned/Reassigned, 5 Order no pdf by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for Federal Insurance Company. (Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Order no pdf by Evelyn Silvestri. (Dicus, Wesley) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#9

(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2022, Joinder of Parties due by 2/18/2022, Discovery due by 6/2/2023, Dispositive motions due by 7/4/2023, Joint Final Pretrial statement due by 11/6/2023, All other motions due by 10/4/2023, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 4/4/2023, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 5/4/2023. Trial Status Conference set for 11/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 12/4/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 6/16/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/12/2022. (ALL) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER. The parties are directed to confer, and then advise the Court, on the selection of a mediator, on or before January 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/12/2022. (ALL) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#12) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (LDJ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER. The parties are directed to confer, and then advise the Court, on the selection of a mediator, on or before January 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/12/2022. (ALL) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2022, Joinder of Parties due by 2/18/2022, Discovery due by 6/2/2023, Dispositive motions due by 7/4/2023, Joint Final Pretrial statement due by 11/6/2023, All other motions due by 10/4/2023, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 4/4/2023, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 5/4/2023. Trial Status Conference set for 11/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 12/4/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Conduct mediation hearing by 6/16/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/12/2022. (ALL) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Order no pdf by Evelyn Silvestri. (Dicus, Wesley) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 2 Case Assigned/Reassigned, 5 Order no pdf by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for Federal Insurance Company. (Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)ctp (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 12/1/2021. (RMF)ctp (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Discovery Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/29/2021. (MB) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Federal Insurance Company.(Raudebaugh, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-1957-WWB-GJK. (MLJ) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2021-CA-009733-O filed in State Court on 10/05/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18947119 filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C State Court Docket and Record, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raudebaugh, Michael) Modified text on 11/19/2021 (BD). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael James Raudebaugh