This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:28:24 (UTC).

SILVERMAN v. SCIAULINO

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SILVERMAN filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against SCIAULINO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Zahid N. Quraishi and Michael A. Shipp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-21087

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Zahid N. Quraishi

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

 

Party Details

Petitioner and In Re

Steven Silverman

Claimant

DREW SCIAULINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and In Re Attorney

KRISTIN EILEEN POLING

Attorney at RUBIN, FIORELLA, FRIEDMAN & MERCANTE LLP

630 Third Avenue, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10017

Claimant Attorney

W. DANA VENNEMAN

Attorney at Law Offices of Gill and Chamas

655 Florida Grove Road, Po Box 760

Woodbridge, NJ 07095

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) BRIEF In Opposition to Docket #4 (POLING, KRISTIN) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#6

(#6) Letter from Kristin E. Poling re #4 Answer to Complaint. (POLING, KRISTIN) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 12:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/02/2020. (jem) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by DREW SCIAULINO.(VENNEMAN, W.) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Claimants. (jem) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER Restraining Suits; a Notice shall be issued by the Clerk of this Court to all persons, firms, entities or corporations, having any claim or suit against the petitioner with respect to which the Complaint seeks exoneration from or limitation of liability, admonishing them to file their respective claims with the Clerk of this Court, in writing, and to deliver or mail to the attorneys for the petitioner, James E. Mercante, Esq. on or before 1/13/2020 or be defaulted. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/06/2019. (jem) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Notice

1 #3

Text of Proposed Order

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DREW SCIAULINO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10159078), filed by Steven Silverman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(POLING, KRISTIN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - It appears as though the document attached to docket entry #4 is a Motion, not an Answer, as it was originally filed. If this is the case, counsel is instructed to file a Notice of Motion and link it to the original filing. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (eaj) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEF In Opposition to Docket #4 (POLING, KRISTIN) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Kristin E. Poling re #4 Answer to Complaint. (POLING, KRISTIN) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 12:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/02/2020. (jem) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by DREW SCIAULINO.(VENNEMAN, W.) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Claimants. (jem) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Restraining Suits; a Notice shall be issued by the Clerk of this Court to all persons, firms, entities or corporations, having any claim or suit against the petitioner with respect to which the Complaint seeks exoneration from or limitation of liability, admonishing them to file their respective claims with the Clerk of this Court, in writing, and to deliver or mail to the attorneys for the petitioner, James E. Mercante, Esq. on or before 1/13/2020 or be defaulted. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/06/2019. (jem) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DREW SCIAULINO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10159078), filed by Steven Silverman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(POLING, KRISTIN) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.