This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/23/2019 at 07:10:50 (UTC).

Silverado Hospice, Inc. v. Alex M. Azar II

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 Silverado Hospice, Inc filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Alex M Azar II. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01007

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Silverado Hospice, Inc.

Defendants

Alex M. Azar

Alex M. Azar, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian M Daucher

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

650 Town Center Drive 10Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1993

Ashton Taylor-Misha Massey

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

650 Town Center Drive 10Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1993

Defendant Attorney

Karen Yumi Paik

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#12

11 #3

Exhibit C

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alex M. Azar, II answer now due 8/28/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Alex M. Azar, II.(Attorney Karen Yumi Paik added to party Alex M. Azar, II(pty:dft))(Paik, Karen) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Silverado Hospice, Inc., upon Defendant Alex M. Azar, II served on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk G. Ortega. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to HHS Clerk Shantell Siggetts. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Daucher, Brian) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) 60-Day Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary of United States Department of Health and Human Services. (gk) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Silverado Hospice, Inc.. (Daucher, Brian) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Silverado Hospice, Inc.. (Daucher, Brian) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Silverado Hospice, Inc., identifying Silverado Senior Living Holdings, Inc. (Daucher, Brian) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Silverado Hospice, Inc.. (Daucher, Brian) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23804685 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Silverado Hospice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Brian M Daucher added to party Silverado Hospice, Inc.(pty:pla))(Daucher, Brian) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Silverado Hospice, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen Paik