This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:13:36 (UTC).

Silver v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Silver filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Norton and Mary Gordon Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03495

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

Referral Judge

Mary Gordon Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Rene Silver

Murrells Inlet, SC 29576

Defendants

Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc

McKesson Specialty

CVS Health One

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Summons Issued as to Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc, CVS Health One, McKesson Specialty. Service due by 4/30/2020. (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc, CVS Health One, McKesson Specialty, filed by Jane Rene Silver. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(hada, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/20/2019. (hada, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jane Rene Silver.(hada, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #1

Supporting Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER. Plaintiff has paid the filing fee and has submitted proposed summonses for each defendant. The Clerk is directed to issue the summonses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/31/2020. (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #13 Summons Issued, #12 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Jane Rene Silver 115 Yucca Avenue Box 372 Murrells Inlet, SC 29576 (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Issued as to Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc, CVS Health One, McKesson Specialty. Service due by 4/30/2020. (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER. Plaintiff has paid the filing fee and has submitted proposed summonses for each defendant. The Clerk is directed to issue the summonses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/31/2020. (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order with required documents, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Jane Rene Silver 115 Yucca Avenue Box 372 Murrells Inlet, SC 29576 (hada, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 12/20/2019. (hada, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#9) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 200016842 (hada, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jane Rene Silver.(hada, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc, CVS Health One, McKesson Specialty, filed by Jane Rene Silver. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(hada, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.