This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:10:37 (UTC).

Silva v. Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Silva filed an Other lawsuit against Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jill L. Burkhardt and Cynthia Bashant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02313

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jill L. Burkhardt

Presiding Judge

Cynthia Bashant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Silva

Defendants

Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.

Clearview Home Improvements Inc.

Sun Coast Remodelers

Clearview Home Improvements Inc. doing business as Clearview Home Energy Solutions

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yana A. Hart

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group, APC

2221 Camino Del Rio South, Suite 101

San Diego, CA 92108

Evangeline Athena Dech

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group

2221 Camino Del Rio South, Suite 101

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorneys

Fredrick Stuart Levin

Attorney at Buckley LLP

100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1525

David W Baumgarten

Attorney at Yale and Baumgarten LLP

1450 Frazee Road, Suite 308

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Certificate of Service

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Silva. Clearview Home Improvements Inc. served. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (jmo). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sun Coast Remodelers.(Baumgarten, David)Attorney David W Baumgarten added to party Sun Coast Remodelers(pty:dft) (jmo). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Silva. Sun Coast Remodelers served. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (jmo). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick)Attorney Fredrick Stuart Levin added to party Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.(pty:dft) (jmo). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Silva. Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. served. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (jmo). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Evangeline Athena Dech on behalf of Maria Silva (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dech, Evangeline). Attorney Evangeline Athena Dech added to party Maria Silva (pty:pla). Modified on 12/10/2019 - Removed duplicate text (jah). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc., Sun Coast Remodelers, Clearview Home Improvements Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13231806.), filed by Maria Silva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02313-BAS-JLB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Hart, Yana)(sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Silva. Clearview Home Improvements Inc. served. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (jmo). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 3/4/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Joint Discovery Plan due 2/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/10/2020.(jmo)(dsn) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sun Coast Remodelers.(Baumgarten, David)Attorney David W Baumgarten added to party Sun Coast Remodelers(pty:dft) (jmo). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #5 ). Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc., answer due on or before 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/3/20. (jmo) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Silva. Sun Coast Remodelers served. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (jmo). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick)Attorney Fredrick Stuart Levin added to party Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.(pty:dft) (jmo). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Silva. Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. served. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (jmo). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Evangeline Athena Dech on behalf of Maria Silva (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dech, Evangeline). Attorney Evangeline Athena Dech added to party Maria Silva (pty:pla). Modified on 12/10/2019 - Removed duplicate text (jah). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc., Sun Coast Remodelers, Clearview Home Improvements Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13231806.), filed by Maria Silva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02313-BAS-JLB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Hart, Yana)(sxa)(jrd) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less