This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 07:49:13 (UTC).

Silva v. Scott et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Silva filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Scott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Mahan and Daniel J. Albregts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00091

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miguel Silva

Defendants

Gregory A Scott

Landstar Ranger, Inc.

Scott A. Gregory

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramzy P Ladah

Attorney at Ladah Law Firm

517 S. 3Rd Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Karie N. Wilson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway #200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Bruce Alverson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Pkwy., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-22-846303-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6765961) by Landstar Ranger, Inc.. Proof of service due by 4/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/19/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Landstar Ranger, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/20/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/4/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 2/10/2022. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (JQC) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Miguel Silva. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ladah, Ramzy) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/14/2022.(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of 26(f) Conference by Miguel Silva. (Ladah, Ramzy) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Scott A. Gregory. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Scott A. Gregory. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of 26(f) Conference by Miguel Silva. (Ladah, Ramzy) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/14/2022.(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Miguel Silva. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ladah, Ramzy) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 2/10/2022. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (JQC) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/20/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/4/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Landstar Ranger, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-22-846303-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6765961) by Landstar Ranger, Inc.. Proof of service due by 4/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDSTAR RANGER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce Alverson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karie N. Wilson