This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2019 at 07:35:26 (UTC).

Silva v. Matrix Absence Management, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 Silva filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Matrix Absence Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karin J. Immergut. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01610

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karin J. Immergut

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Judi L Silva

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Matrix Absence Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Bradley J. Schrock

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

William E. Weiner

David G. Hosenpud

Hank Stebbins

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Answer to #4 Answer to Complaint-Notice of Removal, Counterclaim . Filed by Judi L Silva. (Schrock, Bradley) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) , First Counterclaim against Plaintiff Judi L Silva. Filed by Matrix Absence Management, Inc.. (Weiner, William) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Matrix Absence Management, Inc.. (Stebbins, Hank) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/6/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/9/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/9/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (joha) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV34222 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6031615 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Matrix Absence Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Stebbins, Hank) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • (#7) Scheduling Order by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Due to a calendar conflict, the telephonic Rule 16 Conference is reset for 12/12/2019 at 10:00AM in Portland by telephone before Judge Karin J. Immergut. The previous date of 12/11/2019 is VACATED. (jy) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#6) Scheduling Order by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 12/11/2019 at 10:00AM in Portland by telephone before Judge Karin J. Immergut. Before the Conference, at a minimum counsel must conduct real-time conferral by telephone to prepare a proposed case-management schedule to be submitted to the Court prior to the Rule 16 Conference. The parties shall submit a written joint status report (to include proposed case management schedule) no later than 12/5/2019 that include deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial. Parties shall also determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file separately with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26-2 no later than 12/5/2019. (jy) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Answer to #4 Answer to Complaint-Notice of Removal, Counterclaim . Filed by Judi L Silva. (Schrock, Bradley) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) , First Counterclaim against Plaintiff Judi L Silva. Filed by Matrix Absence Management, Inc.. (Weiner, William) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Matrix Absence Management, Inc.. (Stebbins, Hank) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/6/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/9/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/9/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (joha) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV34222 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6031615 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Matrix Absence Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Stebbins, Hank) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less