This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2020 at 07:09:57 (UTC).

Silva v. Goetze's Candy Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Silva filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Goetze's Candy Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kandis A. Westmore and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-07143

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kandis A. Westmore

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sabrina Silva

Defendant

Goetze's Candy Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory Weston

1405 Morena Blvd, Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

Defendant Attorneys

Amit Rana

Attorney at Venable LLP

101 California Street, Suite 3800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Angel A. Garganta

Attorney at Venable LLP

101 California Street, Suite 3800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Antonia Isabella Stabile

Attorney at Venable LLP

101 California, Suite 3800

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#16

15 #2

Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion

15 #1

Declaration of Gregory S. Weston and Ex. 1 thereto

#15

#14

12 #1

Proposed Order Granting Defendant Goetze's Candy Company, Inc.'s Motio

#12

#7

#5

#4

#3

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 (Goetze's Delcaration)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 (Notice of Acknowledgement of Service)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 (Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint)

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Proposed Order re #19 MOTION to Remand Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Sabrina Silva. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Remand filed by Sabrina Silva. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 12/23/2020. Replies due by 12/30/2020. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing to January 5, 2021. Motion Hearing is now set for 1/5/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers as to: Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Goetze's Candy Company, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint. (Related documents(s) #12 )Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/gonzalez-rogers-yvonne-ygr/ (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING SET TUESDAY DECEMBER 1, 2020.The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #12 SET 12/1/21020 at 2:00 PM is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Motion to Dismiss ) filed byGoetze's Candy Company, Inc.. (Garganta, Angel) (Filed on 11/20/2020) Modified on 11/23/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Sabrina Silva. Responses due by 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory S. Weston and Ex. 1 thereto, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion)(Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 11/19/2020) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Goetze's Candy Company, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint ) filed byGoetze's Candy Company, Inc.. (Garganta, Angel) (Filed on 11/12/2020) Modified on 11/13/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Goetze's Candy Company, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint ) filed bySabrina Silva. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 11/4/2020) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Goetze's Candy Company, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by Goetze's Candy Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/4/2020. Replies due by 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Goetze's Candy Company, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss)(Garganta, Angel) (Filed on 10/21/2020) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interested Entities by Sabrina Silva (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goetze's Candy Company, Inc. (Garganta, Angel) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Goetze's Candy Company, Inc. (Garganta, Angel) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2021 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Goetze's Candy Company, Inc... (Garganta, Angel) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Amit Rana on behalf of Defendant Goetze's Candy Company, Inc. (Rana, Amit) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Weston (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/28/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant Goetze's Candy Company, Inc.'s Notice of Removal Of Action To Federal Court (Filing fee of $400.00 paid, Receipt No. 0971-15061711) from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG20071342. (). Filed by Goetze's Candy Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Notice of Acknowledgement of Service), #3 Exhibit 3 (Goetze's Delcaration), #4 Civil Cover Sheet )(Garganta, Angel) (Filed on 10/14/2020) Modified on 10/14/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Weston