This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2023 at 08:44:00 (UTC).

Silva v. Cowan Intermodal Group LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2023 Silva filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Cowan Intermodal Group LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01085

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jorge Delgado Silva

Defendants

Collin Miller

Cowan Systems, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Akiva Ofshtein

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey A. Segal

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Collin Miller from Supreme Court of the State of New York - County of Queens, case number INDEX NO. 726695/2022. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16394397) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-C) (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

1 #1

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit A-C

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Collin Miller. (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 3/9/2023 at 11:00 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins parties will be prompted to input the security code 1085#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. In addition, plaintiff is directed to serve on defendants a complete set of medical releases and HIPAA authorizations prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/15/2023. (PW) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#6

(#6) Letter re proposed joint letter by Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Collin Miller (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#7

(#7) Proposed Scheduling Order re: case management plan by Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Collin Miller (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN is hereby adopted. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/9/2023 ) (RG) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION re Initial Conference Hearing,, Set Deadlines, re proper Cowan defendant by Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Collin Miller (Attachments: #1 Supplement certification of party citizenship) (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

9 #1

Supplement certification of party citizenship

#10

(#10) STIPULATION SUBSTITUTING PROPER DEFENDANT. So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/10/2023. (TL) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cowan Systems, LLC, Collin Miller, filed by Jorge Delgado Silva. (Ofshtein, Akiva) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Cowan Systems, LLC, Collin Miller. (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Cowan Systems, LLC, Collin Miller. (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cowan Systems, LLC, Collin Miller, filed by Jorge Delgado Silva. (Ofshtein, Akiva) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION SUBSTITUTING PROPER DEFENDANT. So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/10/2023. (TL) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION re Initial Conference Hearing,, Set Deadlines, re proper Cowan defendant by Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Collin Miller (Attachments: #1 Supplement certification of party citizenship) (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN is hereby adopted. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/9/2023 ) (RG) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 03/09/23. All parties appeared by telephone. The parties are to file a stipulation regarding substitution of defendant by 03/16/23. The Court will adopt the parties' proposed Case Management Plan by separate order; fact discovery to end 08/01/23; expert discovery to end 11/01/23. (PW) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Scheduling Order re: case management plan by Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Collin Miller (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter re proposed joint letter by Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Collin Miller (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 3/9/2023 at 11:00 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins parties will be prompted to input the security code 1085#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. In addition, plaintiff is directed to serve on defendants a complete set of medical releases and HIPAA authorizations prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/15/2023. (PW) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (SR) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Collin Miller. (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cowan Intermodal Group LLC, Collin Miller from Supreme Court of the State of New York - County of Queens, case number INDEX NO. 726695/2022. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-16394397) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-C) (Segal, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less