This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2021 at 09:37:58 (UTC).

Silva-Prentice et al v. Turco et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Silva-Prentice filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Turco. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Patti B. Saris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11580

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert Silva-Prentice

Dionisio Paulino

Defendants

Secretary Thomas Turco

Carol Mici

Christopher Fallon

Paul Henderson

Charles Primack

Steven Kenneway

James Ferreira

Patrick Depalo

Joseph Freitas

Dean Gray

David Shaw

James Allain

Paul Birri

Jason Lanpher

Stuart McCulloch

Dennis Breslin

Robert D'Amadio

James Murphy

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patricia A. DeJuneas

Attorney at Sibbison & DeJuneas

1 Mckinley Square

Boston, MA 02109

Bridget A. Zerner

Attorney at Markham Read Zerner LLC

One Commercial Wharf West

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant Attorney

Bradley A. Sultan

Attorney at Mass. Department of Correction

70 Franklin St., Suite 600

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed Brian Mulvey served on served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021 . (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Modified on 11/5/2021 to correct service date information. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed Katie Appel served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Modified on 11/5/2021 to correct service date information . (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#13

(#13) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 30 days after service of all defendants to File Answer by Carol Mici, Thomas Turco.(Sultan, Bradley) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to James Allain, Katie Appel, Paul Birri, Dennis Breslin, Robert D'Amadio, Patrick Depalo, Christopher Fallon, James Ferreira, Joseph Freitas, Dean Gray, Raymond Harvey, Paul Henderson, Steven Kenneway, Jason Lanpher, Evan Laranjo, FNU Lawless, Jamie Marchand, Stuart McCulloch, Thomas Merlino, Carol Mici, Brian Mulvey, James Murphy, Mark O'Reilly, Daniel Paul, Charles Primack, Jennifer Redd, David Shaw, Robert Southworth, Jeffrey Souza, Michael Thomas, Thomas Turco, Raymond Turcotte. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE: re payment of fee (Silva-Prentice prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at SBCC (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer- Paulino) issued to the Treasurer at SBCC (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS (service by USMS), copy Local Rule 4.1 (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#6

(#6) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. The Applications (Docket Nos. 2, 4) to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs are granted. The Clerk shall provide a copy of this Order to the treasurer at the Souza-Baranowski Correctional Center. The Clerk shall issue summonses for service of the named defendants and the plaintiffs shall serve the summonses, complaint, and this Order in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Because the plaintiffs are proceeding in forma pauperis, they may elect to have the United States Marshals Service complete service with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. The plaintiffs shall have 90 days from the date of the issuance of the summons to complete service. (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#4

1 #8

Category Form

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed Brian Mulvey served on served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021 . (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Modified on 11/5/2021 to correct service date information. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed Katie Appel served on 11/3/2021, answer due 11/24/2021. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Modified on 11/5/2021 to correct service date information . (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde). (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docket(#15) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Status Conference held on 10/25/2021. Case Called. Colloquy re: status of case and service on all defendants. (Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Sultan, Zerner, DeJueas) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docket(#14) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/25/2021 11:30 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by VIDEO CONFERENCE. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 30 days after service of all defendants to File Answer by Carol Mici, Thomas Turco.(Sultan, Bradley) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filing fee/payment: $ 2.49, receipt number 1BST086924 for #1 Complaint, (Phillips, Sophie) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filing fee/payment: $ 19.00, receipt number 1BST086919 for #1 Complaint, (Phillips, Sophie) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to James Allain, Katie Appel, Paul Birri, Dennis Breslin, Robert D'Amadio, Patrick Depalo, Christopher Fallon, James Ferreira, Joseph Freitas, Dean Gray, Raymond Harvey, Paul Henderson, Steven Kenneway, Jason Lanpher, Evan Laranjo, FNU Lawless, Jamie Marchand, Stuart McCulloch, Thomas Merlino, Carol Mici, Brian Mulvey, James Murphy, Mark O'Reilly, Daniel Paul, Charles Primack, Jennifer Redd, David Shaw, Robert Southworth, Jeffrey Souza, Michael Thomas, Thomas Turco, Raymond Turcotte. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE: re payment of fee (Silva-Prentice prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at SBCC (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer- Paulino) issued to the Treasurer at SBCC (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS (service by USMS), copy Local Rule 4.1 (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. The Applications (Docket Nos. 2, 4) to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs are granted. The Clerk shall provide a copy of this Order to the treasurer at the Souza-Baranowski Correctional Center. The Clerk shall issue summonses for service of the named defendants and the plaintiffs shall serve the summonses, complaint, and this Order in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Because the plaintiffs are proceeding in forma pauperis, they may elect to have the United States Marshals Service complete service with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. The plaintiffs shall have 90 days from the date of the issuance of the summons to complete service. (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Silva-Prentice.(DeJuneas, Patricia) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia A. DeJuneas on behalf of Robert Silva-Prentice (DeJuneas, Patricia) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dionisio Paulino.(Zerner, Bridget) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Dionisio Paulino, Robert Silva-Prentice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Category Form)(Zerner, Bridget) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less