This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2020 at 09:32:25 (UTC).

Silva-Negrete v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Silva-Negrete filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael E. Hegarty and Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03029

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ana Silva-Negrete

Defendant

Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Anton Sirchio

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Kelly L. Kafer

Attorney at Morgan Rider Riter Tsai, P.C.

1512 Larimer Street, Suite 450

Denver, CO 80202

Tory Drew Riter

Attorney at Morgan Rider Riter Tsai, P.C.

1512 Larimer Street, Suite 450

Denver, CO 80202

Tyler Douglas Olson

Attorney at Morgan Rider Riter Tsai, P.C.

1512 Larimer Street, Suite 450

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/24/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#20

(#20) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 11/23/2020. Discovery Deadline: July 30,2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline: August 30, 2021. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: May 31, 2021. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: July 7, 2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#19

(#19) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Kafer, Kelly) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#16

(#16) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12 November 2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #15 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#15

(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Kafer, Kelly) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#14

(#14) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 October 2020. Before the Court is Defendant's Response to Show Cause Order (ECF #12 ). In light of the information provided by Defendant, this Court's Order (ECF #10 ) is discharged. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #6 ) on or before November 10, 2020. It is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on November 23, 2020, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado.Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/16/2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Supplement to Notice of Removal re #10 by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kafer, Kelly) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#10

(#12) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Supplement to Notice of Removal re #10 by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kafer, Kelly) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

1 #13

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit H

1 #9

Exhibit G

1 #8

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/24/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 11/23/2020. Discovery Deadline: July 30,2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline: August 30, 2021. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: May 31, 2021. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: July 7, 2021. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Kafer, Kelly) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/16/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-03029-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12 November 2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #15 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Kafer, Kelly) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 October 2020. Before the Court is Defendant's Response to Show Cause Order (ECF #12 ). In light of the information provided by Defendant, this Court's Order (ECF #10 ) is discharged. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #6 ) on or before November 10, 2020. It is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on November 23, 2020, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado.Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/16/2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Supplement to Notice of Removal re #10 by Defendant Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kafer, Kelly) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Kafer, Kelly) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Riter, Tory) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STATE COURT ORDER For Extension of Time. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Defendant why the Court should not remand this case (or recommend that it be remanded) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 10/22/2020, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/8/2020. (jgonz, ) Modified pursuant to #14 on 10/26/2020 (cmadr, ). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anton Sirchio on behalf of Ana Silva-NegreteAttorney Joseph Anton Sirchio added to party Ana Silva-Negrete(pty:pla) (Sirchio, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Garrison Property and Casualty on 09/10/2020 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Ana Silva-Negrete.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company from District Court, County of Denver, State of Colorado, Case Number 2020CV33073. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7529273), filed by Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L)(Kafer, Kelly) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler D. Olson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly L. Kafer