This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2021 at 08:27:05 (UTC).

Silva et al v. Tristar Products, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Silva filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Tristar Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing and Kevin R. Sweazea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00740

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Fashing

Referral Judge

Kevin R. Sweazea

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Precious Silva

Jonathan Silva

Defendants

Tristar Products, Inc.

Tristar Innovative Products, Inc.

PA Tristar Products, Inc.

Kohl's Department Sores, Inc. doing business as Kohl's

Zhongshan Jinguang Household Appliance Manufacture Co., Ltd.

John Doe Corporations

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katie Rose Marion

Attorney at McGinn, Montoya, Love & Curry, P.A.

201 Broadway Blvd. Se

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Randi McGinn

Attorney at MCML, PA

201 Broadway, Se

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Donald J. Ward, III

Attorney at Searcy Denney Scarola Barnhart & Shipley, P.A.

2139 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Elise Sherr Allison

Attorney at Searcy Denney Scarola Barnhart & Shipley, P.A.

2139 Palm Beach Lakes Boulevard

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Defendant Attorneys

Tiffany L Roach Martin

Attorney at Modrall, Sperling, Roehl, Harris & Sisk, PA

P.O. Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103-2168

Tim L Fields

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

P.O. Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103-2168

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Kohl's Department Sores, Inc., Tristar Products, Inc. re #1 Complaint of Agreed Extension to file Answer/Response (Roach Martin, Tiffany) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Precious Silva, Jonathan Silva. Kohl's Department Sores, Inc. served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (McGinn, Randi) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Kohl's Department Sores, Inc., Tristar Products, Inc., Zhongshan Jinguang Household Appliance Manufacture Co., Ltd. (arp) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Jonathan Silva, Precious Silva re 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Notice of Appearance and Good Standing (Marion, Katie) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAssociation Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7831403 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Jonathan Silva, Precious Silva (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Marion, Katie) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Jonathan Silva, Precious Silva by Katie Rose Marion on behalf of: Elise Sherr Allison Searcy Denney Scarola Barnhart & Shipley, P.A. 2139 Palm Beach Lakes BoulevardWest Palm Beach, FL 33409 561-686-6300 Fax 561-478-0754 eallison@searcylaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Marion, Katie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAssociation Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7831373 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Jonathan Silva, Precious Silva (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Marion, Katie) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Docket(#4) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Jonathan Silva, Precious Silva by Katie Rose Marion on behalf of: Donald J. Ward, III Searcy Denney Scarola Barnhart & Shipley, P.A. 2139 Palm Beach Lakes BoulevardWest Palm Beach, FL 33409 561-686-6300 Fax 561-478-0754 djw@searcylaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Marion, Katie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Jonathan Silva, Precious Silva (McGinn, Randi) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7825384 re #1 Complaint filed by Jonathan Silva, Precious Silva (Payment made via Pay.gov)(McGinn, Randi) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Precious Silva, Jonathan Silva. (McGinn, Randi) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PA TRISTAR PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZHONGSHAN JINGUANG HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE MANUFACTURE CO. LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRISTAR PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant